Broadway v. ConAgra Foods

Plaintiff: Donna Broadway
Defendant: ConAgra Foods
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00055
Filed: February 15, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Broadway failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with my orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR, )
March 26, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 27, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Broadway's 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is denied. Broadway shall have until April 29, 2013, to amend her Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Conagra in accordance with this memorandum and order. If Broadway fails to file an amended complaint, Broadways claims against Conagra will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and for failure to follow this courts order s. Broadway shall keep the court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines:Check for amended complaint on April 29, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Broadway v. ConAgra Foods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Broadway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]