Harrill v. Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC

Plaintiff: Michael R. Harrill
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00057
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On or before May 15, 2013, the defendant shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 or show cause by written affidavit why the defendant cannot comply with the rules of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)
January 7, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 36 Motion to Extend. Depositions due June 30, 2014. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)
April 7, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 39 Motion to Extend. Depositions due September 30, 2014. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)
September 15, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 46 ) is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. The parties will pay their own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harrill v. Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Harrill
Represented By: John P. Weis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]