White et al v. American Correctional Association et al

Defendant: American Correctional Association, Jose F. Barderas, Bryan Collier, David Dewhurst, Cody Ginsel, Brad Livingston, Rick Perry and John Whitmeyer
Plaintiff: Jacquelyne A. Serrato and Patrick A. White
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00062
Filed: February 25, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff Jacquelyne A. Serrato is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Orde r will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff Jacquelyne A. Serrato the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: June 10, 2013: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form AO240)(TCL )
June 27, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall have until July 29, 2013, to apprise the court of her current address, in the absence of which she will be dismissed from this case without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 29, 2013: deadline for informing court of address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
July 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 9 ) is denied. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to either show cause why he is entitled to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) or pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees. In the absence of either action by Plaintiff, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: September 1, 2013: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
July 31, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Serrato's claims against Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
September 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This matter is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
March 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismiss al of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the pro se civil complaint form and the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of the c ourt is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: April 25, 2013: Check for MIFP or payment and amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms)(TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: White et al v. American Correctional Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Correctional Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose F. Barderas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Collier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dewhurst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Ginsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Livingston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Whitmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyne A. Serrato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]