Schreier v. Coventry Health Care of Nebraska

Plaintiff: Philip Schreier
Defendant: Coventry Health Care of Nebraska
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00071
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER - The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Rule 26(f) Report Deadline and Deadline for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike (Filing No. 11 ) is granted. The parties shall have until June 11, 2013, to fi le their joint motion for entry of a protective order related to the administrative record. The defendant shall produce the administrative record and relevant plan documents within two weeks of the court's entry of an agreed protective order. The parties shall have until August 9, 2013, to meet, confer, and report to the court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). The plaintiff shall have until July 15, 2013, to file a response to the defendant's Motion to Strike (Filing No. 6 ). The defendant shall have to July 25, 2013, to file a reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
June 6, 2013 14 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 13 parties' Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
July 15, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (Filing No. 16 ) is held in abeyance. The plaintiff shall have until July 18, 2013, to supplement the motion to amend to bring it in compliance with NECivR 15.1, by, for example, filing a notice stating whether the motion is unopposed or opposed. Absent the defendant's consent to the amendment, the defendant shall have until July 30, 2013, to file a brief in support of its Motion to Strike (Filing No. 6 ) and in opposition to the plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint (Filing No. 16 ). The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket to terminate the "Amended Motion to Amend" (Filing No. 17 ) as a motion and change the docket text to reflect the filing is a proposed amended complaint and an attachment related to the motion to amend (Filing No. 16 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
August 5, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: On or before September 5, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the undersigned magistrate judge, at thalken@ned.uscour ts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this or der, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The deadline for filing a planning report, the defendant's Motion to Strike (Filing No. 6 ), and the plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Filing No. 19 ) are terminated as moot upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
August 19, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER - The parties' joint stipulation (Filing No. 25 ) is granted and this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schreier v. Coventry Health Care of Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Schreier
Represented By: Dennis T. Chapman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Health Care of Nebraska
Represented By: Kenneth G. Kubes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]