Reynolds v. Cox Cable et al

Plaintiff: Harold Reynolds and Community Telecast
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Cox Communications and Cox Cable
Case Number: 8:2013cv00086
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Timothy L. Ashford's 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff Harold Reynolds shall have until August 16,2013, to advise the Court whether he intends to obtain counsel or whether he intends to proceed pro se. Plaintiff Com munity Telecast, Inc., is dismissed without prejudice for failure to obtain counsel. Plaintiff Harold Reynolds is provisionally granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR) Modified on 8/1/2013 to correct judge (MKR).
March 28, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER-Plaintiff Community Telecast, Inc.s motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied with prejudice. Plaintiff Harold Reynoldss motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
April 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing, on or before May 10, 2013, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Deadline set for 5/10/2013.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Cox Cable et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Reynolds
Represented By: Timothy L. Ashford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Telecast
Represented By: Timothy L. Ashford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Cable
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]