Griffin v. Schmaderer et al

Defendant: Todd Schmaderer, Douglas County Department Corrections and Mike Myers
Plaintiff: Arthur James Griffin, Jr.
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00088
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 18 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Arthur James Griffin, Jr. shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $.20 by 5/16/13, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/16/2013: initial partial filing feepayment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to institution as directed)(ADB, )
May 28, 2013 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Griffin's Complaint - Pro Se 1 is dismissed without prejudice because he failed to comply with this court's orders. All pending motions are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
June 10, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 43 , 44 , 45 , 46 and 47 . Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(EJL)
June 24, 2013 63 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Griffins Motion for Application for 28 U.S.C. § 2241 52 , and Motions to Modify or Amend 48 , 49 , 54 , 55 , 56 , 58 and 59 , liberally construed as Motions for Relief Under Rule 59(e), are denied. Griffin is w arned that if he continues to file meritless motions, he could be subject to sanctions, including, but not limited to, being enjoined from filing any further pleadings, motions, or other items related to this matter without prior authorization from this court. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
July 11, 2013 64 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 61 Motion to Amend; denying 62 Motion to Amend. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Griffin v. Schmaderer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Schmaderer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Department Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur James Griffin, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]