Thompson v. Omaha Public Power District

Plaintiff: Helen R. Thompson
Defendant: Omaha Public Power District
Case Number: 8:2013cv00106
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER upon the Joint MOTION for Protective Order 13 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
October 28, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 24 ) is denied. Defendant's objection (Filing No. 35 ) as denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate plaintiff's response (Filing no. 30 ) as a pending motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
December 11, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge by Terry A. White,, On or before January 12, 2015, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case; and Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. ***Set All Deadlines: ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 1/12/2015.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
January 14, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL granting 47 Stipulation for Dismissal. This matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Omaha Public Power District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen R. Thompson
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Public Power District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]