Dixon v. Verhey et al

Defendant: Johnson Feed, Inc. and Brian Lee Verhey
Plaintiff: Linda M Dixon
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00111
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2014 52 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Expert Witness Opinion (filing 38 ) is denied. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witness (filing 39 ) is denied. By or before June 17, 2014, the parties shall meet and confer regarding supplementation of their respective expert disclosures. Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and to Extend Deposition and Discovery Deadlines (filing 50 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as set forth above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
July 17, 2014 68 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's motion in limine (Filing No. 55 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. The defendants' motion in limine (Filing No. 57 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
July 17, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER - This matter is before the court on the parties' objections to the trial deposition of Dr. Joel Cotton. The court finds the hearsay objection to page 34, lines 11-22; the hearsay objection to page 35, lines 2-7; and the foundation objection to page 47, line 24 to page 48, line 5, should be overruled. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
May 22, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff (filing 7 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Thomas DeLay's appearance as counsel for Plaintiff and shall terminate future notices to Mr. DeLay in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dixon v. Verhey et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Feed, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lee Verhey
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M Dixon
Represented By: Kathryn J. Derr
Represented By: Thomas H. DeLay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]