Widtfeldt v. Daugherty et al

Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, US Treasury and James Daugherty
402) 925-2564 (fax: James Widtfeldt
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00120
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2014 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall file his proof of service in this case within 14 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order with the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. Plaintiff's objections to the F&R are overruled in p art and granted in part. The F&R of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 7 , is adopted to the extent set forth in this Memorandum and Order; however, the court will not dismiss the case at this time. The magistrate judge is ordered to determine if the plaintiff complies with this Memorandum and Order and to take the appropriate steps thereafter. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
March 10, 2014 11 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - By order dated January 31, 2014, the plaintiff was granted 14 days in which to file proofs of service with the Clerk of Court. Filing No. 10, Memorandum and Order at 2. He was advised that failure to do so would result in immediate dismissal. Id. That time has elapsed and the plaintiff has not filed proofs of service. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
November 13, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER - The plaintiff has until the close of business on December 17, 2013, to file with the Clerk of Court evidence of service or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as against the defendants for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Widtfeldt v. Daugherty et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Treasury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daugherty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
402) 925-2564 (fax: James Widtfeldt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]