Cox v. First National Bank

Plaintiff: Stacy Cox
Defendant: First National Bank and First National Bank of Omaha
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00126
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadlines (filing 44 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment (filing 48 ) is granted, in part. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing 40 ) by July 2, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
July 21, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
July 30, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - First National's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 40 ) is granted; The above-captioned action will be dismissed with prejudice; All pending motions are denied as moot; and A separate judgment will follow. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cox v. First National Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Cox
Represented By: Eric B. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank
Represented By: Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]