Teens of Tomorrow v. City of Bellevue, Nebraska et al

Defendant: City of Papillion, City of Omaha Nebraska, City of Lincoln, Nebraska, City of LaVista, Nebraska, City of LaVista, City of Fremont, Nebraska, City of Fremont, City of Council Bluffs, Iowa, City of Council Bluffs, City of Columbus, Nebraska, City of Columbus, City of Carter Lake, Iowa, City of Carter Lake, City of Bellevue, Nebraska, City of Papillion, Nebraska, City of Ralston and City of Ralston, Nebraska
Plaintiff: Teens for Tomorrow, Inc and Teens of Tomorrow
Case Number: 8:2013cv00127
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant City of Omaha's opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 96 is sustained. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
July 10, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 107 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend. The parties shall have until July 25, 2013, to file the Rule 26 Planning Report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
July 29, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2013 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
July 30, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendant Ralston's 101 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted. Plaintiff's complaint as to the City of Ralston is dismissed without prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
August 21, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Richard L. Boucher and Boucher Law Firm are deemed withdrawn as counsel for plaintiff. Plaintiff shall advise the Court before August 30, 2013, whether it has procured substitute counsel and substitute counsel shall enter an appearance and participate in the planning conference scheduled for that date. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
August 30, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff Teens of Tomorrow shall have until September 13, 2013, to secure counsel. Failure to do so will result in this action being dismissed without prejudice. If an appearance of counsel occurs by the close of business on September 13, 2013, a planning conference will be held on: Friday, September 20, 2013, at 8:15 a.m. in the Chambers of the undersigned, Suite 3190, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to Teens of Tomorrow) (AOA)
September 17, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
May 31, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (Filing No. 37 ) is denied. The objections to plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (Filing Nos. 61 , 67 , 71 , and 72 ) are sustained. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
May 31, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The stipulation of the parties is approved and adopted. The parties are bound by the terms thereof. The City of Fremont is dismissed as a defendant in this action, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
May 31, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER- Plaintiff's complaint as to Carter Lake is dismissed without prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Plaintiff's complaint as to Council Bluffs is dismissed without prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teens of Tomorrow v. City of Bellevue, Nebraska et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Papillion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha Nebraska
Represented By: Rosemarie R. Horvath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln, Nebraska
Represented By: Jeffery R. Kirkpatrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of LaVista, Nebraska
Represented By: Gerald L. Friedrichsen
Represented By: William M. Bradshaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of LaVista
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont, Nebraska
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Council Bluffs, Iowa
Represented By: Tamra L. Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Council Bluffs
Represented By: Tamra L. Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus, Nebraska
Represented By: Stephen C. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Carter Lake, Iowa
Represented By: Joseph D. Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Carter Lake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellevue, Nebraska
Represented By: Patrick J. Sullivan
Represented By: Aimee C. Bataillon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Papillion, Nebraska
Represented By: Gerald L. Friedrichsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ralston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ralston, Nebraska
Represented By: Mark A. Klinker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teens for Tomorrow, Inc
Represented By: Richard L. Boucher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teens of Tomorrow
Represented By: Richard L. Boucher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]