Galbraith v. TPG TeleManagement, Inc.

Defendant: TPG TeleManagement, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert A. Galbraith
Case Number: 8:2013cv00149
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Adam Vergne's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (filing 21 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Adam Vergnes appearance as counsel of record for Defendant and shall terminate future notices to him in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL)
February 18, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
March 18, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The written discovery deadline is extended to July 11, 2014. The deposition deadline is extended to July 11, 2014. The dispositive motion deadline is extended to August 15, 2014. Trial is tentatively set for the month of November, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
June 6, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, upon notice of settlement, that on or before July 7, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the undersigned, at Gossett@ned.uscourts.gov, a d raft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; and The Rule 16 planning conference set for June 16, 2014, is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
July 3, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 37 Stipulation for Dismissal - this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galbraith v. TPG TeleManagement, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG TeleManagement, Inc.
Represented By: Chad P. Richter
Represented By: Adam J. Vergne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Galbraith
Represented By: Michael J. Merrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]