Smith v. Wolvin

Plaintiff: Lyle G. Smith
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Defendant: Carolyn W. Wolvin
Case Number: 8:2013cv00154
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Extend. The plaintiff's oral motion to extend the time for the plaintiff's reply brief is granted. The defendant shall have on or before October 30, 2013, in which to file and serve her respons e to the plaintiff's brief. The plaintiff shall have on or before November 27, 2013, in which to file and serve a reply brief. The case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 4 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JSF)
November 7, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Defedant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before November 30, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; wi thin one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
January 21, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend. The clerk shall amend the docket to reflect the correct spelling of the defendant's name and title to Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JSF)
May 13, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Commissioner's decision is affirmed. The appeal is denied. Judgment in favor of the defendant will be entered in a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
May 20, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee. The Clerk shall send 3 summons forms and 3 USM-285 forms to Plaintiff's attorney for service of process. Plaintiff shall complete the forms and send them back to the Clerk. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk shall sign the summonses and forward them, together with copies of the complaint, to the US Marshal for service. The Marshal shall serve the United States without payment of costs or fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wolvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle G. Smith
Represented By: Shirley Peng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Wolvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]