Intercall, Inc. v. Examination Management Services, Inc.

Defendant: Examination Management Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Intercall, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2013cv00175
Filed: June 11, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER on 16 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
November 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The provisions of the court's earlier, initial progression order remain in effect, and in addition to those provisions, the following shall apply: 1. Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Motions for partial summaryjudgment shall be filed not later than May 9, 2014. See NECivR 56.1 and 7.0.1. 2. Motions to Alter Dates. All requests for changes of deadlines shall be directedto the magistrate judge by appropriate motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
August 28, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 22 ) filed by Plaintiff InterCall, Inc., is denied; The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 25 ) filed by Defendant Examination Management Services, Inc., is granted in part, as follows: a. The Court finds that InterCall failed to deliver or implement the Rapid Learning enhancements as promised in the InterCall Order Form and thereby breached the terms of the InterCall Order Form; b. The Motion is otherwise denied; and The Motions to Strike (Filing Nos. 28 and 44 ) filed by Defendant Examination Management Services, Inc., and the Motion to Strike (Filing No. 31 ) filed by Plaintiff InterCall, Inc., are denied as moot, without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intercall, Inc. v. Examination Management Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Examination Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Steen
Represented By: Michael J. Mills
Represented By: Scott E. Daniel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercall, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick R. Guinan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]