Lo Grande v. Douglas County Dept. of Corrections et al

Defendant: Medical Dept., Douglas County Dept. of Corrections, CB RN P0115, CB RN C0035, CB RB C0035, Dr. Morin and Dr. Lisa Mullen
Plaintiff: Charles J. Lo Grande
HSA: Tammy Bussovsly
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00177
Filed: June 12, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to waive his filing fee 9 is denied. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time in which to pay his $14.00 initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1 4.00 by September 20, 2013. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by this date, plaintiff's case will be dismissed. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at plaintiff's institution. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/20/2013: initial partial filing fee payment due.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
October 1, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - The September 20, 2013, deadline has passed and plaintiff has not paid the initial partial filing fee in this matter. Therefore, plaintiff's case will be dismissed for failing to comply with the Court's orders. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
July 29, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Charles J. Lo Grande shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $14.00 by August 19, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a w ritten motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/19/2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and institution as directed)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lo Grande v. Douglas County Dept. of Corrections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Dept. of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB RN P0115
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB RN C0035
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB RB C0035
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Morin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lisa Mullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Lo Grande
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Hsa: Tammy Bussovsly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]