Rath v. State of Nebraska, et al

Defendant: State of Wisconsin, State of Nebraska's Sex Offender Registry Office, State of Nebraska and State of Wisconsin's Sex Offender Registry Office
Plaintiff: Phillip J. Rath, Jr.
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00204
Filed: July 8, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part plaintiff's motion seeking appointment of counsel 11 . The court grants Plaintiff's request that this court reconsider the amount of his initial partial filing fee, and denies his request for the appointment of counsel. Accordingly, Plaintiff's previously filed Motion to Appoint Counsel 8 is also denied. The Clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiff's cur rent institution. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to Tamra Glynn, Inmate Accounting Supervisor, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Central Office Accounting, PO Box 94661, Lincoln, NE 68508) (JSF)
August 30, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion seeking the appointment of counsel (Filing No. 13 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
July 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Phillip J. Rath, Jr. shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $.14 by 8/26/13, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written moti on. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline for 8/26/2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed to Tamra Glynn, Inmate Accounting Supervisor, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Central Office Accounting, PO Box 94661, Lincoln, NE 68508) (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rath v. State of Nebraska, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska's Sex Offender Registry Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin's Sex Offender Registry Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J. Rath, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]