Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Deon Maurice Allen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00214
Filed: July 12, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall send 3 summons forms and 3 USM-285 forms to plaintiff for service of process on the United States. Plaintiff shall complete the forms and send them back to the Clerk. The Clerk shall sign the summons and forward them, together with copies of the complaint, to the US Marshal for service. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
November 19, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Pursuant to Fed.R Civ.P. 4(m), plaintiff shall, on or before December 6, 2013, show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
December 10, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the defendant shall have until January 1, 2014, to complete service of process upon the defendant. If he fails to do so, this action shall be subject to immediate dismissal without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
January 8, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 1 , is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon Maurice Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]