Activision TV, Inc. v. Pinnacle Bancorp, Inc.

Defendant: Pinnacle Bancorp, Inc.
Plaintiff: Activision TV, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00215
Filed: July 12, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 110 Featured Case ORDER granting the plaintiff and intervenor plaintiff's 105 Motion to Seal as follows. The movants' motion (Filing No. 106 ), brief (Filing No. 107 ), and index of evidence (Filing No. 108 ) shall remain under access restricted to the movants, the court, and the defendant Jon Bruning and his counsel. The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket entries accordingly. Jon Bruning shall have to on or before January 27, 2014, to file a response to the motion requesting this court investigate the defendant Jon Bruning's conduct (Filing No. 106 ). Jon Bruning shall file the response under seal. After filing the Clerk of Court shall amend the docket entry to allow access restricted to the court, the plaintiff, the intervenor plaintiff, and the defendant Jon Bruning and his counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
January 14, 2014 111 Featured Case ORDER ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - MPHJ's motions for preliminary injunction, Filing Nos. 53 and 85 , are granted, and defendants Bruning, Cookson and Lopez are enjoined from taking any steps to enforce the cease and desist order issued to F arney Daniels on July 18, 2013, in any manner that would prevent or impede the Farney Daniels firm from representing MPHJ in connection with licensing and litigation of U.S. patents owned by MPHJ with respect to companies based in, or having opera tions in, Nebraska. If, however, at some point during the investigation evidence supports a claim of bad faith, the Attorney General is free to revisit this preliminary injunction with the court. The parties shall attempt to draft an agreed upon fi nal permanent injunction and submit the draft to the court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. If that is not possible, the court will order the magistrate judge to enter an expedited progression order dealing with this part of the case, so that the case can proceed to the merits and the court can enter a permanent injunction or address the merits on motions for summary judgments. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
January 29, 2014 122 Featured Case ORDER - The parties met and were unable to agree upon the form of a permanent injunction. Filing No. 121 . As a result, Activision and MPHJ are ordered to submit their summary judgment motions on or before February 14, 2014. The state defendants are ordered to submit their response within 14 days of the filing of the summary judgment motions. Thereafter, Activision and MPHJ shall have 7 days to file a reply. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR, )
April 4, 2014 177 Featured Case ORDER denying the state Attorney General's 117 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
September 19, 2013 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Activision's 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the extent set forth herein, The law firm of Farney Daniels and the attorneys in that law firm may file their application pro hac vice in this case. The law f irm of Farney Daniels and the attorneys therein are free to represent their client Activision in this case and any other federal patent case directly or indirectly associated with this case and the Nebraska Attorney General's cease and desist order is not aplicable to those cases. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
September 26, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will file an Amended Memorandum and Order in conjunction with this Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
September 26, 2013 38 Featured Case AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Activision's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 8 is granted to the extent set forth herein. The law firm of Farney Daniels and the attorneys in that law firm may file their application pro hac vice in this cas e. The law firm of Farney Daniels and the attorneys therein are free to represent their client Activision in this case and any other federal patent case directly or indirectly associated with this case and the Nebraska Attorney General's cease and desist order is not applicable to those cases. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
September 30, 2013 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Activision's motion for preliminary injunction, Filing No. 8 , is granted and defendants Bruning, Cookson and Lopez are enjoined from taking any steps to enforce the cease and desist order issued to Farney Daniels on Ju ly 18, 2013, in any manner that would prevent or impede the Farney Daniels firm from representing Activision in connection with licensing and litigation of U.S. patents owned by Activision with respect to companies based in, or having operations i n, Nebraska. If, however, at some point during the investigation evidence supports a claim of bad faith, the Attorney General is free to revisit this preliminary injunction with the court. Defendants' objection to plaintiff's exhibits, Filing No. 35 , is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
November 7, 2013 81 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The motion to stay pending appeal, Filing No. 68 , is denied; Defendants motion to dismiss, Filing No. 21 , is denied; Defendants motions to stay briefing, Filing Nos. 57 and 72 , are denied; Defendants have 14 days f rom the date of this Memorandum and Order to file a brief with regard to intervenors motion for preliminary injunction. The intervenor shall have 7 days thereafter to respond to the brief of the defendants. MPHJs motion to expedite, Filing No. 56 , is granted to the extent set forth in this Memorandum and Order; and MPHJs motion to intervene, Filing No. 50 , is granted. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Activision TV, Inc. v. Pinnacle Bancorp, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Bancorp, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Activision TV, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Sean P. Connolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]