Kaiser v. Gallup, Inc.

Plaintiff: Susan Kaiser
Defendant: Gallup, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00218
Filed: July 16, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 39 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 38 the Stipulated Motion to Amend. Non-expert depositions deadline is 7/20/2014. Expert depositions deadline is 10/15/2014. Pretrial conference set for 1/26/2015 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE, before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 18, 2014 43 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the provisions of the court's earlier, progression order (# 39 ) remain in effect, and in addition to those provisions, the following amended deadlines shall apply: 1. Discovery Deadlines: a. Deposition Deadlin e. All non-expert depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by August 14, 2014. Expert depositions shall be completed by October 15, 2014. b. Written Discovery Deadline. All interrogatories, requests for ad mission and requests for production or inspection, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by July 30, 2014. Counsel may stipulate to extensions of time to respond to discovery requests in accordance with Fed. R. Ci v. P. 29, but such extensions shall not extend any of the dates in this order; any request to extend the deadlines of this order shall be sought by motion. c. Discovery Motions. Discovery motions shall be filed not later than August 5,2014, as to ma tters which are then ripe for decision; discovery matters arising after that date may be the subject of motions until the deposition deadline. Counsel are reminded of the provisions of NECivR 7.0.1(i). 2. Motions to Alter Dates. All requests for c hanges of deadlines or settings established herein shall be directed to the magistrate judge by appropriate motion, including all requests for changes of trial dates. Such motions shall not be considered in the absence of a showing by counsel of du e diligence in the timely development of this case for trial and the recent development of circumstances, unanticipated prior to the filing of the motion, which require that additional time be allowed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
July 8, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Issue Rule 45 Subpoena and to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Second Set of Requests for Production. Plaintiff shall produce the requested materials within fourteen (14) days of this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
July 31, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER granting the Plaintiff's Unopposed 7 Motion for Trial Venue in Lincoln Nebraska. Trial of this matter will take place in Lincoln, Nebraska. The Clerk of Court shall modify the docket sheet to reflect this change in trial location. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kaiser v. Gallup, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Kaiser
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallup, Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Cristin M. Berkhausen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]