Stearns v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Stearns
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00329
Filed: November 7, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
August 25, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Upon agreement reached during a settlement conference with the undersigned, IT IS ORDERED: On or before September 24, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case; Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; and Any deadlines currently pending are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
September 29, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the 36 Stipulation for Dismissal is approved; The Complaint in the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice; and The parties will bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stearns v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A. Forman
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stearns
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Represented By: Richard E. Fradette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]