Apples' Way, LLC v. Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC et al

Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Apples' Way, LLC
 
Case Number: 8:2014cv00090
Filed: March 19, 2014
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER that Attorney Larry Welch, Jr., has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Mr. Welch is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why he is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
June 16, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant's motion, (Filing No. 24 ), is granted. On or before June 27, 2014, the parties shall either file their jointly prepared Rule 26(f) Report, or they shall contact my chambers to set a scheduling conference for setting case progression deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
June 23, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER - The motion to permit James Morrow and Julie Jorgensen to withdraw as counsel on behalf of Texas Roadhouse, (filing no. 28 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Apples' Way, LLC v. Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Julie A. Jorgensen
Represented By: James C. Morrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Scott Paul
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: James C. Boesen
Represented By: Albert M. Engles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apples' Way, LLC
Represented By: WOODKE, GIBBONS LAW FIRM
Represented By: Michael T. Gibbons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]