Leavitt v. Wickham et al

Defendant: Isidro Baca, R. Bannister, James G. Cox, Doni, Frank Draser, E.K. McDaniel, Secretary of State Ross Miller, Jerry Howell, D.K. Jennings, L.C. Adams, Cole Morrow, Jennifer Nash, Dwight Neven, Brian Sandoval, Ronald Shansky and Harold Wickham
Plaintiff: Cody Leavitt
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00490
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 7 Motion for TRO and 8 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from entry of this Order to mail to the Clerk of Court a new Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of the pauper form and instructions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - forms mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
May 21, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER that the Court certifies to the Court of Appeals that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Court of Appeals - SLD)
January 2, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER RE: INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. This case will not be referred for formal mediation. The Court finds that the parties will benefit from informal discussions in an effort to settle this case. A courtesy copy of this order and the complaint shall be provided to defendants' counsel by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: defense counsel - SLD)
April 2, 2013 2 Featured Case ORDER Denying 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall be DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a new complaint on the required form in a new action together with either a n ew pauper application wi th all required, and new, attachments or payment of the $350.00 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall SEND plaintiff a copy of the papers that he filed along with the complaint and pauper forms and instructions for both forms. The Clerk shall enter final judgment accordingly, dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 24, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER that 21 and 27 Applications for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis are GRANTED. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office and to the NDOC Chief of Inmate Services. Within 21 days of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court regarding acceptance of service. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 23, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 4 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Reopen Case. Plaintiff has 30 days from entry of this Order to file a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel is Denied. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of the pauper form and instructions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - forms mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Leavitt v. Wickham et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bannister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Draser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Ross Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Howell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.K. Jennings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.C. Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Morrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Shansky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Leavitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]