Bill Adamson et al. Vs. USA

Plaintiff: Richard E. Meppen, Kathleen McKnight, Wesley McKnight, Carman Meikle, Gary R. Meikle, Judy Kroshus, Dan Lawson, Lorraine Lawson, John Lindenmeir, Nancy Lindenmeier, Leo Lindenmeier, Leslie Leverett, Esther Levine, Jason E. Marich, David C. Marshall, Destiny Marx, Leroy Marx, Hillary McAdam, Melanie McAdam, Robert McAdam, Manfred Jurgeit, Brandon Knapp, Tracy Knapp, Cherie Knox, Cora Knox, Justin Knox, Bill Adamson, Sharon Adamson, Lorillee A. Babcock, Amanda Bailie, Thomas W. Bailie, Jr., Jennifer Bronaugh, Sterling Bronaugh, Steve Bronaugh, Annette Brown, Kristopher Brown, Haley McGrath, Hazyn McGrath, John Caulk, Martinique Caulk, Jared Hires Caulk, John Hires Caulk, Taylor Hires Caulk, Janet Chapman, Scott Chapman, Everett A. Cirio, Kathleen M. Cook, Tom W. Cook, II, Brandy Crutcher, James Crutcher, Mackinnon Crutcher, Jake Crutcher, Angela Daniel, Julianna Daniel, William T. Daniel, Vance Daniel, Diane R. Davis, Douglas Davis, Felicia R. Davis, Ramona Davis, William K. Davis, Pamela Doerr, Donna Dohm, John Dohm, Joshua Doyle, Lori Doyle, Patrick Doyle, Tanna Doyle, Jeremy Gottlieb, Daryl R. Grover, Patrick Grover, Rosemary Higgins, Michael A. Humphrey, Kim James, Kilita Jones, Michael Jones, Jeanie Jurgeit, Betty Mesi, Eric Mesi, Fred Mesi, Dennis Morelli, Marcia Morelli, Bruce E. Nagel, Jeanette M. Nagel, Joseph Neff, Melissa Neff, Elizabeth Bailie, Sean R. Neff, Katelyn Neff, Adriana Noriega, Mary Noriega, Asa Noriega, Andrew Noriega, Jennifer Patterson, Travis Patterson, Christina Perez, Charles Presnell, Russell Lance Puckett, Teresa Reed, James Reed, Julian Reed, Alexis Reed, Bert Reinsma, Patricia Reinsma, Deborah Sue Rose, Lane H. Rose, II, David Shields, Rhonda Shields, Joseph A. Specchio, Barbara Specchio, Wesley M. Stalions, Misty L. Stalions, Angelica B. Stalions, Stevie Staubs, Randall Staubs, Linda Stephan, David Stephan, Haley Stephan, John Stephan, Connie J. Stevens, Edward J. Stevens, Derek Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, Isabel Taylor, Connor Taylor, Michael Teeter, Virginia Tripp, David Tripp, Tommy Vaughn, Jennifer Vaughn Hayer, Austin Vaughn, W. R. Warn and Rolaine Warn
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2008cv00621
Filed: November 24, 2008
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Washoe
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Presiding Judge: Brian E. Sandoval
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1346 Tort Claim

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED ORDER RE: Hearing held 08/03/2010 93 Motion for Order Providing For Clawback of Information Inadvertently Disclosed. It is recognized that the prosecution and defense of these related actions will require each party to rev iew and to disclose large quantities of information and documents through the discovery process. (See Order for additional specifics). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 08/04/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
August 13, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court THE COURT ORDERS that a video conference hearing on TCID's 107 Motion for mediation of all claims shall be conducted on September 15, 2010 at 1:00 PM. The parties in the captioned cases shall be present in Reno, Nevada, in a Courtroom to be designated later by minute order, and Judge Lloyd D. George shall preside from Las Vegas, Nevada. ( See pdf Order for additional specifics ) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/13/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 27, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, in the interests of case management and the consolidation for oral argument of pending dispositive and consolidation motions, and pending discussion during the video conference hearing of the potential for mediation, the following motion s are DENIED without prejudice to their reinstatement following the scheduling of oral argument on pending dispositive and consolidation motions: 56 Motion to Consolidate Cases denied. See Attached PDF/Image for Specifics. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
November 16, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER re # 120 Stipulated Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/16/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 16, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS that a video conference hearing presided over by this court in Las Vegas from Courtroom 6B at the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse to Courtroom 6 in Reno at the Bruce R. Thompson United States Courthouse and F ederal Building shall be conducted on Thursday, March 24, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. to hear arguments on the following motions:Adamson, et al. v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike class al legations (dkt 26 ) (denied without prejudice to subsequent reinstatement); Moore, et al. v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM:United States' motion to strike class action allegations (dkt #10) (denied without prejudice to rec onsideration in ruling on the motion for class certification)Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (dkt #68);Adamson, et al. v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM:United States' motion to strike class action allegations (dkt #22) (denied for case management purposes without prejudice to reinstatement). Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
March 29, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the following motions are DENIED withoutprejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementionedproceedings: Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus I), 3:08-cv-0246-LDG-RAMDefendant Greater Nevada Builders and Steven F. Campoys renewed motion todismiss for failure to timely effect service of the complaint and for failure to state aclaim upon which relief can be granted 447 - Federal defendants motion for summary judgment 461 , Uhouse v. Bureau of Reclamation, 3:08-cv-0285-LDG-RAM, andFederal defendants motion for summary judgment 218 . Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-0167-LDG-RAM - Plaintiffs motion for certification of class action and for appointment of classcounsel 68 . Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-0713-LDG-RAM -Defendant Crisp Development, Inc.s motion to dismiss 71 , Defendants Greater Nevada Builders and Steven F. Campoys motion to dismiss 79 , Defendant Truckee Carson Irrigation Distri ct and David P. Overvolds motion to dismiss 83 , and Federal defendants motion for summary judgment 112 . THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that, as previously indicated in the 10/21/2010 hearing, defendant Truckee Carson Irrigation Districts pending motio n for mediation in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus I) 495 , 3:09-cv-0713-LDG-RAM is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that plaintiffs motion to exceed local rule 7-4 page limitation in Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-0649-LDG-RAM 34 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 12, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The following FTCA jurisdictional and related FTCA non-Flood Control Act motions will be heard by the court at the April 18, 2011, hearing in Reno: Adamson v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM: United States' 25 motion to dismiss (denied without prejudice to reconsideration of issues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing); Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to dismiss (#9) (denie d without prejudice to reconsideration of issues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing); Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike jury demand (#27) (denied without prejud ice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#20) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) Adamson v. Un ited States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike jury demand (#20) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#21) (denied without prejudice to r einstatement) United States' motion to dismiss (#23) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to dismiss (#15) United States' motion to s trike claims of prejudgement interest and attorneys fee (#17) Plaintiffs' motion to convert motion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment (#27). Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
April 18, 2011 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The following motions will be heard by the court on Monday, June 13, 2011, in Reno,Nevada, at 9:00 am in a courtroom to be determined and posted at a later date; and continued, ifnecessary, to Tuesday, June 14, 2011, at 9:00 am.Adamson v. Un ited States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#25) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration ofissues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity(#127)Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#9) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration ofissues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing)United States motion f or summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity(#120)Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to strike jury demand (#19) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims (# 20) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#74)Adamson v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to strike jury demand (#20) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#21) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss (#23) (de nied without prejudice to reinstatement)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#78)Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#15)United States motion to strike claims of prejud gement interest and attorneys fees (#17)Plaintiffs motion to convert motion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment (#27)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#33) ( Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Lloyd D. George.) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
June 10, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that United States' motion to strike class action allegations (#10, filed in Case No. 3:09-cv-00167) is reinstated and GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Ps' motion for class certification (#68, filed in Case No. 3:09-cv-00167) is DENI ED. FURTHER ORDERED that Ps' motion for leave to amend the complaint to name new plaintiffs or, in the alternative, motion to intervene (#138, filed in Case No. 3:09-cv-00167) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/9/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 4, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 145 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement re 174 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
August 4, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 175 Proposed Order. IT IS ORDERED that 148 MOTION for Good Faith Settlement Determination and Dismissal of Claims is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 8, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT REGARDING TCID DIRECTORS, re 179 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 12, 2011 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the United States motion to dismiss VictoriaLopez Lasane in Adgett 20 is GRANTED, and its motion to dismiss Hayley McGrath andHazyn McGrath in Adgett 20 is DENIED as moot. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS tha t the United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims in Adamson II 21 is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that the United States motion to dismiss plaintiffs identified as minors in Adamson I 25 is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS t hat the United States motion to dismiss debtors in bankruptcy in Adamson II 23 is GRANTED as to plaintiff Jeremy Gottlieb and DENIED without prejudice as to plaintiffs James and Denise Spracklin. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
September 23, 2011 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the following motions are DENIED without prejudice to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementioned proceedings: Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus I), 3:08-cv-00246-LDG-RAM - #541, #543, #544, #545, #546, #547, #548, #549, #550, #551; Uhouse v. Bureau of Reclamation, 3:08-cv-00285-LDG-RAM - #283, #285, #286, #287, #288, #289, #290, #291; Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-00649-LDG-RAM - #70;< /p> Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-00713-LDG-RAM - #175, #176, #178, #179, #180, #181, #182, #183, #184, #187; Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-00463-LDG-RAM - #15 and #27. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/22/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
September 23, 2011 185 Opinion or Order of the Court THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus I), 3:08-cv-00246-LDG-RAM, defendant Lynon Countys #564 is DENIED as moot; that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-00713-LDG-RAM, defendant Lyon Countys #195 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot; that in Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-00649-LDG-RAM, the United States #69 motion to renew and reinstate that motion is DENIED as moot; that in Adgett v. United S tates, 3:09-cv-00649-LDG-RAM the United States #71 motion to renew and reinstate that motion is DENIED as moot; that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-00713-LDG-RAM, the United States #45 motion to dismiss duplicativ e claims by certain plaintiffs is hereby GRANTED;that in Adamson v. United States (Adamson II) 3:09-cv-00715-LDG-RAM, the United States #72 and #73 motions to renew those motions are DENIED as moot; that in Adamson v. United States (Adamson II) 3:09-cv-00715-LDG-RAM, the United States #75 motion to renew that motion is DENIED as moot.
September 26, 2011 186 Opinion or Order of the Court THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the United States motions for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity in Adamson v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM ( 127 ); Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM (#120); Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAM (#74); Adamson v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM (#78); and Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAM (#33) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
September 28, 2012 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: various motions. Motion Hearing set for Monday, 1/14/2013, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom to be determined before Judge Lloyd D. George. Please see attached for specific details. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 18, 2012 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 317 Notice of Change of Attorney filed by Edward J. Stevens. Attorney Robert C. Maddox,Nancy H Jasculca,Vernon E. Leverty,Calvin R.X. Dunlap,Monique Laxalt for Edward J. Stevens added. Attorney Lee T. Hotchkin, Jr; Robert R. Hager and Treva J. Hearne terminated. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 12/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 27, 2013 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting # 413 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Robert C. Maddox,Nancy H Jasculca,Vernon E. Leverty, Patrick Leverty, Calvin R.X. Dunlap,Monique Laxalt for Cherie Knox added. Attorneys Treva Hearne and Lee Hotchkin terminated. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 2/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 27, 2013 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementioned proceedings: Uhouse v. Bureau of Reclamation , 3:08-cv-0285-LDG : Plaintiffs' motio n to reconsider the magistrate judges order denying plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement (#428) Adamson v. United States , 3:08-cv-0621-LDG : Motion for summary judgment as to ten specific claims (# 212 ) Moore v. U nited States , 3:09-cv-0167-LDG : Motion to set date for trial (#215) Adgett v. United States , 3:09-cv-0649-LDG : Motion for summary judgment as to ten specific claims (#147), and Motion to set a date for trial (#157) A damson v. United States , 3:09-cv-0715-LDG : Motion for summary judgment as to ten specific claims (#149), and Renewed motion to dismiss claims of 168 enumerated plaintiffs as untimely (#166) Ames v. United States , 3:10-cv-0463-LDG : Motion to set a date for trial (#108) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 3/28/2013 to correct file date (DRM).
March 31, 2014 455 Opinion or Order of the Court THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court: Adamson v. United States , 3:08-cv-00621-LDG. United States' # 25 Motion to dismiss, United States ' # 212 Motion for summary judgment as to Ten Specific Claims, and Plaintiffs' # 446 Motion to dismiss renewal and reinstatement of motions. Moore v. United States , 3:09-cv-0167-LDG. Plaintiffs' #244 Motion to di smiss United States renewal United States' renewal and reinstatement of motions. Adgett v. United States , 3:09-cv-0649-LDG. Plaintiffs' #184 Motion to dismiss United States renewal and reinstatement of motions. Adamson v. United States , 3:09-cv-0715-LDG. Plaintiffs' #387 Motion to dismiss United State' renewal and reinstatement of motions. Ames v. United States , 3:10-cv-0463-LDG. Plaintiffs' #27 Motion to conver t motion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment, and Plaintiff's #135 Motion to dismiss United States' renewal and reinstatement of motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2014 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementioned proceedings: Kroshus v. United States, 3:08-cv-0246-LDG Plaintiff Judy Kroshus renewal a nd reinstatement of motion for summaryjudgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (#875) Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-0167-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (# 219) Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-0649-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#161) Kroshus v. United States, 3:09-cv-0713-LDG Plaintiffs renewal and reinstatement of motion for summary judgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (#409) Adamson v. United States, 3:09-cv-0715-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#170) Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-0463-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#112) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 12, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 98 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED, in accordance with Rule 25(a) Fed.R.Civ.P., the claims of plaintiff Lorilee Babcock are hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bill Adamson et al. Vs. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Meppen
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen McKnight
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley McKnight
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carman Meikle
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R. Meikle
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Kroshus
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Lawson
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Lawson
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lindenmeir
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lindenmeier
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Lindenmeier
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Leverett
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Levine
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason E. Marich
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Marshall
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Marx
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Marx
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary McAdam
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie McAdam
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McAdam
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manfred Jurgeit
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Knapp
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Knapp
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Knox
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Knox
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Knox
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Adamson
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Adamson
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorillee A. Babcock
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bailie
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Bailie, Jr.
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bronaugh
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Bronaugh
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Bronaugh
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Brown
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Brown
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley McGrath
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazyn McGrath
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caulk
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinique Caulk
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Hires Caulk
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hires Caulk
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Hires Caulk
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Chapman
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Chapman
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett A. Cirio
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Cook
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom W. Cook, II
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Crutcher
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Crutcher
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackinnon Crutcher
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Crutcher
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Daniel
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianna Daniel
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Daniel
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Daniel
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane R. Davis
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Davis
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia R. Davis
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Davis
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William K. Davis
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Doerr
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Dohm
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dohm
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Doyle
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Doyle
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Doyle
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanna Doyle
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Gottlieb
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl R. Grover
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Grover
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Higgins
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Humphrey
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim James
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kilita Jones
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Jurgeit
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Mesi
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mesi
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Mesi
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Morelli
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Morelli
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Nagel
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette M. Nagel
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Neff
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Neff
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bailie
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean R. Neff
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Neff
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Noriega
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Noriega
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asa Noriega
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Noriega
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Patterson
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Patterson
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Perez
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Presnell
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Lance Puckett
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Reed
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Reed
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Reed
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Reed
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert Reinsma
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reinsma
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sue Rose
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane H. Rose, II
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shields
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Shields
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Specchio
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Specchio
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley M. Stalions
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty L. Stalions
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica B. Stalions
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevie Staubs
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Staubs
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Stephan
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stephan
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Stephan
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephan
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie J. Stevens
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Stevens
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Taylor
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Taylor
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Taylor
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Taylor
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Teeter
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Tripp
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tripp
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Vaughn
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vaughn Hayer
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Vaughn
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. R. Warn
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolaine Warn
Represented By: Robert R. Hager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]