Bourne v. New Hampshire, State of, et al

Plaintiff: Samuel J. Bourne
Defendant: Carol Ann Conboy, Linda Stewart Dalianis, James E. Duggan, Eileen Fox, Gary E. Hicks, Robert J. Lynn, New Hampshire Supreme Court and New Hampshire, State of
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00251
Filed: July 2, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. The Matter will be reassigned. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 4, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring motions to the Magistrate Judge 3 Motion to Dismiss, 8 Motion to Strike, 4 Motion to Change Venue. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
September 5, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 15 Order referring motions to the Magistrate Judge. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
September 11, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Recusal and Change of Venue. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
September 14, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss; denying 8 Motion to Strike. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bourne v. New Hampshire, State of, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel J. Bourne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Ann Conboy
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Stewart Dalianis
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Duggan
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Fox
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E. Hicks
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Lynn
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Supreme Court
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]