PPL ENERGYPLUS, LLC et al v. SOLOMON et al

Plaintiff: CALPINE NEWARK, LLC, EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC, GENON ENERGY, INC., NAEA OCEAN PEAKING POWER, LLC, PSEG POWER, LLC, ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, CALPINE BETHLEHEM, LLC, CALPINE MID-MERIT, LLC, CALPINE VINELAND SOLAR, LLC, CALPINE MID-ATLANTIC MARKETING, LLC, PPL ENERGYPLUS, LLC, PPL BRUNNER ISLAND, LLC, PPL HOLTWOOD, LLC, PPL MARTINS CREEK, LLC, PPL MONTOUR, LLC, PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC, LOWER MOUNT BETHEL ENERGY, LLC, PPL NEW JERSEY SOLAR, LLC, PPL NEW JERSEY BIOGAS, LLC, PPL RENEWABLE ENERGY, LLC, CALPINE ENERGY SERVICES L.P., CALPINE MID-ATLANTIC GENERATION, LLC and CALPINE NEW JERSEY GENERATION, LLC
Defendant: LEE A. SOLOMON, JEANNE M. FOX, JOSEPH L. FIORDALISO and NICHOLAS V. ASSELTA
Movant: PJM INDUSTRIAL CUSTOMER COALITION and NEW JERSEY, DIVISION OF RATE COUNSEL
Intervenor_defendant: CPV POWER DEVELOPMENT, INC.
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00745
Filed: February 9, 2011
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Essex
Referring Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2012 148 Featured Case Notice to the Parties: Please see the attached memorandum and respond accordingly. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 09/19/2012.
September 28, 2012 151 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment (ECF 88 ) is denied; that the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by CPV Power (ECF 98 ) isdenied; that the motion for summary judgment by Nicholas Asselta, Joseph Fiordaliso, Jeanne Fox and Lee Solomon (the Board of Public Utilities) (ECF No. 100 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 9/28/2012. (mmh)
October 11, 2013 305 Featured Case MEMORANDUM filed. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/11/2013. (mmh)
October 19, 2011 69 Featured Case MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/19/2011. (mmh)
October 20, 2011 70 Featured Case SUPERSEDING MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/20/11. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PPL ENERGYPLUS, LLC et al v. SOLOMON et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE NEWARK, LLC
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENON ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAEA OCEAN PEAKING POWER, LLC
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSEG POWER, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. O'SHAUGHNESSY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC CITY ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: PHILIP JOSEPH PASSANANTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY
Represented By: WILLIAM J. O'SHAUGHNESSY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE BETHLEHEM, LLC
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE MID-MERIT, LLC
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE VINELAND SOLAR, LLC
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE MID-ATLANTIC MARKETING, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL ENERGYPLUS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL BRUNNER ISLAND, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL HOLTWOOD, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL MARTINS CREEK, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL MONTOUR, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL SUSQUEHANNA, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOWER MOUNT BETHEL ENERGY, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL NEW JERSEY SOLAR, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL NEW JERSEY BIOGAS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPL RENEWABLE ENERGY, LLC
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE ENERGY SERVICES L.P.
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE MID-ATLANTIC GENERATION, LLC
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALPINE NEW JERSEY GENERATION, LLC
Represented By: MARA E. ZAZZALI
Represented By: KEVIN MCNULTY
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE A. SOLOMON
Represented By: JENNIFER S. HSIA
Represented By: BRIAN O. LIPMAN
Represented By: ALEX MOREAU
Represented By: LISA J. MORELLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEANNE M. FOX
Represented By: JENNIFER S. HSIA
Represented By: BRIAN O. LIPMAN
Represented By: ALEX MOREAU
Represented By: LISA J. MORELLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH L. FIORDALISO
Represented By: JENNIFER S. HSIA
Represented By: BRIAN O. LIPMAN
Represented By: ALEX MOREAU
Represented By: LISA J. MORELLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS V. ASSELTA
Represented By: JENNIFER S. HSIA
Represented By: BRIAN O. LIPMAN
Represented By: ALEX MOREAU
Represented By: LISA J. MORELLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: PJM INDUSTRIAL CUSTOMER COALITION
Represented By: STEPHEN R. KERN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: NEW JERSEY, DIVISION OF RATE COUNSEL
Represented By: BRIAN WEEKS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: CPV POWER DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Represented By: SEAN J. KIRBY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]