Association For Molecular Pathology et al v. United States Patent and Trademark Office et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Association For Molecular Pathology, American College of Medical Genetics, American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason and Kathleen Raker
Defendant: United States Patent and Trademark Office, Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing and Michael K. Young
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv04515
Filed: May 12, 2009
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2010 USCA Case Number 2010-1406 from the US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit assigned to 259 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Thomas Parks, Lorris Betz, Michael K. Young, Myriad Genetics, Jack Brittain, John Kendall Morris, Arnold B. Combe, David W. Pershing, Raymond Gesteland, Roger Boyer, James U. Jensen. (nd)
June 16, 2010 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, re: 259 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. (nd)
June 16, 2010 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 259 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. (nd)
June 16, 2010 259 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT from 258 Judgment,. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 906686. (nd)
April 19, 2010 Featured Case Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the termination of this action. (dt)
April 19, 2010 258 Featured Case JUDGMENT granting plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment in part, granting defendant USPTO's motion for judgment on the pleadings, and denying the Myriad Defendants' motion for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/19/10) (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO APPEAL)(ml)
April 5, 2010 257 Featured Case ORDER: To correct an inadvertent omission, the Opinion filed on March 29, 2010 is hereby amended by inserting the following paragraph at page 21: "Amicus curiae Genetic Alliance ("GA") is a not-for-profit, tax-exempt health advocacy organization founded in 1986 (as the Alliance for Genetic Support Groups). It brings together diverse stakeholders that create novel partnerships in advocacy. By integrating individual, family, and community perspectives to improve health systems, Genetic Alliance seeks to revolutionize access to information to enable translation of research into services and individualized decision-making. GA contends that the wholesale abolition of patents on isolated DNA molecules and isolated purified natural substances is legally untenable and undesirable as public policy, because it would diminish the promise of genetic research for patients and negatively affect other areas of medicine." The Amended Opinion will be filed forthwith. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/2/2010) (jpo)
April 5, 2010 256 Featured Case AMENDED OPINION: #98799 For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted in part, Myriad's motion for summary judgment is denied, the USPTO's motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted, and the claims-in- suit are declared invalid pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 101. Submit judgment on notice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/2/2010) (jpo) Modified on 4/5/2010 (ml). Modified on 4/7/2010 (ajc).
March 29, 2010 255 Featured Case OPINION #98799 re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office, 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Breast Cancer Action, David Ledbetter, Arupa Ganguly, Ellen Matloff, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, College of American Pathologists, Lisbeth Ceriani, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, Stephen Warren, Association For Molecular Pathology, Wendy Chung, American Society For Clinical Pathology, Genae Girard, Harry Ostrer, Kathleen Raker, Runi Limary, Elsa Reich, American College of Medical Genetics, Haig Kazazian, 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lorris Betz, Michael K. Young, Arnold B. Combe, David W. Pershing, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, Roger Boyer, Thomas Parks, Myriad Genetics, Jack Brittain, John Kendall Morris. For the reasons set forth in this Opinion, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted in part, Myriad's motion for summary judgment is denied, the USPTO's motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted, and the claims-in-suit are declared invalid pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101. Submit judgment on notice. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/29/2010) (tro) Modified on 4/7/2010 (ajc).
March 10, 2010 254 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/2/2010 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (tro)
February 24, 2010 253 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sabrina Yasmin Hassan on behalf of all plaintiffs. New Address: Public Patent Foundation, Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law, 55 Fifth Avenue, Suite 928, New York, NY, USA 10003, (212) 790-0442. (Hassan, Sabrina)
February 19, 2010 252 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lee Carl Bromberg on behalf of Boston Patent Law Association. New Address: McCarter & English, LLP, 265 Franklin Street, Boston, Massachusetts, USA 02110, 617-449-6500. (Bromberg, Lee)
February 9, 2010 251 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 2, 2010 at 10:00 am before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (eef)
February 8, 2010 250 Featured Case ORDER granting 247 Motion for William G. Gaede, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/8/2010) (js)
February 8, 2010 249 Featured Case ORDER granting 248 Motion for Andrew A. Kumamoto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/8/2010) (js)
February 5, 2010 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 248 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 247 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 02/03/2010, Receipt Number 893505. (jd)
February 3, 2010 248 Featured Case MOTION for Andrew A. Kumamoto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Celera Corporation, Genomic Health, Inc., QIAGEN, N.V., BayBio, The Coalition for 21st Century Medicine, Target Discovery, Inc., XDx, Inc.(mro)
February 3, 2010 247 Featured Case MOTION for William G. Gaede, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Celera Corporation, Genomic Health, Inc., QIAGEN, N.V., BayBio, The Coalition for 21st Century Medicine, Target Discovery, Inc., XDx, Inc.(mro)
January 29, 2010 246 Featured Case DECLARATION of LAURA A. CORUZZI in Support re: 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5 Part 1 of 4, # 8 Exhibit 5 Part 2 of 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 Part 3 of 4, # 10 Exhibit 5 Part 4 of 4)(Poissant, Brian)
January 29, 2010 245 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Morrison, Ross)
January 29, 2010 244 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
January 29, 2010 243 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Brian Poissant dated 1/28/10 re: Request that the Court grant permission for defendants to use a PowerPoint presentation and for plaintiffs if they so choose. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/29/10) (cd)
January 27, 2010 242 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 201 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/26/2010) (tve)
January 27, 2010 241 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: 195 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/26/2010) (tve)
January 27, 2010 240 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 115 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/26/2010) (jfe)
January 27, 2010 239 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Brian M. Poissant dated 1/26/2010 re: Counsel for defendants writes requesting that the Court approve the filing of a reply memorandum by Myriad and the Directors of up to 25 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/26/2010) (tve)
January 27, 2010 238 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: 189 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/26/2010) (tve)
January 27, 2010 237 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 210 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/26/2010) (jfe)
January 26, 2010 236 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF: ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/25/2010) (js)
January 25, 2010 235 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 234 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/25/2010) (jpo)
January 22, 2010 233 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 229 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/20/2010) (tro)
January 21, 2010 232 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Carl Bromberg on behalf of Boston Patent Law Association (Bromberg, Lee)
January 20, 2010 234 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. filed by Dr. Kenneth G. Chahine. (mbe)
January 20, 2010 228 Featured Case DECLARATION of Ellen T. Matloff, MS in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 227 Featured Case DECLARATION of Robert Cook-Deegan in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 226 Featured Case DECLARATION of Thomas B. Kepler in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 225 Featured Case DECLARATION of Fiona E. Murray, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 224 Featured Case DECLARATION of Joseph E. Stiglitz, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 223 Featured Case DECLARATION of Roger D. Klein, M.D., J.D. in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 222 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christopher E. Mason, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 221 Featured Case DECLARATION of Robert L. Nussbaum, M.D. in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 220 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 154 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 219 Featured Case FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment. And in support of 61 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
January 20, 2010 218 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sabrina Yasmin Hassan on behalf of American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker (Hassan, Sabrina)
January 19, 2010 231 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. filed by Kevin E. Noonan.(mbe)
January 19, 2010 230 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 229 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae. filed by Kevin E. Noonan.. (mbe)
January 19, 2010 229 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae. filed by Kevin E. Noonan..(mbe)
January 19, 2010 217 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Sandra S. Park dated 1/13/2010 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs request the Court's approval for the filing of a memorandum of law of no more than 50 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/18/2010) (tro)
January 19, 2010 216 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eileen Elizabeth Falvey on behalf of Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young, Myriad Genetics, Inc. (Falvey, Eileen)
January 15, 2010 215 Featured Case DECLARATION of Emanuel Petricoin, Ph.D. in Support re: 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae.. Document filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Scher, Robert)
January 15, 2010 214 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae.. Document filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University. (Scher, Robert)
January 15, 2010 213 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from William G. Gaede dated 1/6/10 re: counsel for amici curiae requests leave to file an overlength brief that exceeds the 25 page limit stated in the 10/5/07, Individual Practices of Judge Robert W. Sweet. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/12/10) (dle)
January 13, 2010 212 Featured Case BRIEF re: 210 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Boston Patent Law Association.(Shyavitz, Lori)
January 13, 2010 211 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 210 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Boston Patent Law Association. (Shyavitz, Lori)
January 13, 2010 210 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Boston Patent Law Association.(Shyavitz, Lori)
January 13, 2010 209 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boston Patent Law Association.(Shyavitz, Lori)
January 13, 2010 208 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori Jane Shyavitz on behalf of Boston Patent Law Association (Shyavitz, Lori)
January 13, 2010 207 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by George Mason University.(Scher, Robert)
January 13, 2010 206 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re: 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Fine, Aden)
January 11, 2010 205 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Allen Scher on behalf of Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University (Scher, Robert)
January 11, 2010 204 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Rosetta Genomics Ltd. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc..(Scher, Robert)
January 11, 2010 203 Featured Case DECLARATION of Emanuel Petricoin, Ph.D. in Support re: 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae.. Document filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University. (Scher, Robert)
January 11, 2010 202 Featured Case BRIEF re: 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae.. Document filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Scher, Robert)
January 11, 2010 201 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae.. Document filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University. (Scher, Robert)
January 11, 2010 200 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae. Document filed by Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Ltd., Rosetta Genomics, Inc., George Mason University. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scher, Robert)
January 8, 2010 199 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/6/10) (dle)
January 8, 2010 198 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BayBio, The Coalition for 21st Century Medicine, Target Discovery, Inc., XDx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Huttenlocher, Michael)
January 6, 2010 197 Featured Case BRIEF re: 195 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae. [Proposed] Brief for Amici Curiae. Document filed by Celera Corporation, Genomic Health, Inc., QIAGEN, N.V., BayBio, The Coalition for 21st Century Medicine, Target Discovery, Inc., XDx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William G. Gaede, III, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Huttenlocher, Michael)
January 6, 2010 196 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 195 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae.. Document filed by Celera Corporation, Genomic Health, Inc., QIAGEN, N.V., BayBio, The Coalition for 21st Century Medicine, Target Discovery, Inc., XDx, Inc.. (Huttenlocher, Michael)
January 6, 2010 195 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae. Document filed by BayBio, The Coalition for 21st Century Medicine, Target Discovery, Inc., XDx, Inc., Celera Corporation, Genomic Health, Inc., QIAGEN, N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Huttenlocher, Michael)
January 6, 2010 194 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Celera Corporation, Genomic Health, Inc., QIAGEN, N.V..(Huttenlocher, Michael)
January 5, 2010 193 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Sandra S. Park dated 12/31/2009 re: The parties have agreed to a new briefing schedule: Plaintiffs' papers would be due by noon on January 20, 2010; Defendants' reply papers would be due on January 20 ; and oral argument would be held sometime between February 2 and 5, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: The requested submission schedule is approved. Argument will be held February 2 at 10 AM. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/31/2009) (jpo)
January 4, 2010 192 Featured Case STIPULATION that the document annexed as Exhibit L shall be filed with the Clerk's office and shall be part of the record in this case. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/26/09) (dle)
December 31, 2009 191 Featured Case DECLARATION of Laura P. Masurovsky in Support re: 189 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Genetic Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Masurovsky, Laura)
December 31, 2009 190 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 189 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae Genetic Alliance in Opposition to Certain Positions of the Plaintiffs. Document filed by Genetic Alliance. (Masurovsky, Laura)
December 31, 2009 189 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Genetic Alliance.(Masurovsky, Laura)
December 30, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Laura P. Masurovsky to RE-FILE Document 187 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 188 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents must be linked to Corrected Motion. When the Motion is properly re-filed, then refile and link these 2 supporting documents. (db)
December 30, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Laura P. Masurovsky to RE-FILE Document 186 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. ERROR(S): No Signature or s/. (db)
December 30, 2009 188 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Laura P. Masurovsky in Support re: 186 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Genetic Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Masurovsky, Laura) Modified on 12/31/2009 (db).
December 30, 2009 187 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 186 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae Genetic Alliance in Opposition to Certain Positions of the Plaintiffs. Document filed by Genetic Alliance. (Masurovsky, Laura) Modified on 12/31/2009 (db).
December 30, 2009 186 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Genetic Alliance.(Masurovsky, Laura) Modified on 12/31/2009 (db).
December 30, 2009 185 Featured Case DECLARATION of Dennis Bissonnette in Support re: 181 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 30, 2009 184 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support re: 181 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibits 2-8, # 3 Exhibits 9-12, # 4 Exhibits 13-16, # 5 Exhibits 17-21, # 6 Exhibits 22-24, # 7 Exhibit 25, # 8 Exhibits 26-28)(Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 30, 2009 183 Featured Case BRIEF re: 181 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization.(Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 30, 2009 182 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 181 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization. (Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 30, 2009 181 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization.(Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 30, 2009 180 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization.(Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 30, 2009 179 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Cozeolino Tempesta on behalf of Biotechnology Industry Organization (Tempesta, Jennifer)
December 24, 2009 177 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 63 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Morrison, Ross)
December 24, 2009 176 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 175 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Morrison, Ross)
December 24, 2009 175 Featured Case MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office. Responses due by 1/8/2010 Return Date set for 1/21/2010 at 09:00 AM.(Morrison, Ross)
December 24, 2009 174 Featured Case DECLARATION of DR. SEAN TAVTIGIAN in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 178 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Ross E. Morrison dated 12/22/2009 re: Requesting a one day extension until December 24 for defendant United States Patent and Trademark Office to submit its opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, and its cross-motion for judgment on the pleadings. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/23/2009) (jpo)
December 23, 2009 173 Featured Case DECLARATION of JOSEPH STRAUS in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E PART 1, # 6 Exhibit E Part 2, # 7 Exhibit E Part 3, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G Part 1, # 10 Exhibit G Part 2, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 172 Featured Case DECLARATION of DR. MARK SKOLNICK in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 171 Featured Case DECLARATION of Dr. Donna Shattuck in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 170 Featured Case DECLARATION of JOSEPH SCHLESSINGER. PH.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 2)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 169 Featured Case DECLARATION of Dr. John Franklin Sandbach in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 168 Featured Case DECLARATION of WILLIAM E. RUSCONI in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 167 Featured Case DECLARATION of DR. PHILIP R. REILLY in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 166 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Parvin in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 165 Featured Case DECLARATION of TODD OGAARD in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 164 Featured Case DECLARATION of Nancy J. Linck in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 163 Featured Case DECLARATION of RONG LI, PhD in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 162 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jenny Lessman in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 161 Featured Case DECLARATION of DR. MARK A. KAY in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of DR. MARK A. KAY, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 160 Featured Case DECLARATION of Richard P. Frieder, MD in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 159 Featured Case DECLARATION of John J. Doll in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12 Part 1, # 13 Exhibit Part 2, # 14 Exhibit 13 Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 13 Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 14)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 158 Featured Case DECLARATION of Dr. Gregory C. Critchfield in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 157 Featured Case DECLARATION of Melanie K. Bone in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 156 Featured Case DECLARATION of Richard Baer in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 155 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 63 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 154 Featured Case RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 153 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (1) IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Poissant, Brian)
December 23, 2009 152 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. Responses due by 1/8/2010 Return Date set for 1/21/2010 at 09:00 AM.(Poissant, Brian)
December 22, 2009 151 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Brian M. Poissant dated 12/17/09 re: Request for permission to file a memorandum of law of no more than 40 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/18/09) (db)
December 22, 2009 150 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Michael Poissant on behalf of Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young, Myriad Genetics, Inc. (Poissant, Brian)
December 16, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 147 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/20/2009, Receipt Number 706599. (jd)
December 4, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 149 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jfe)
December 4, 2009 149 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 146 Motion for Susan Berke Fogel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/3/2009) (jfe)
December 4, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 148 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jfe)
December 4, 2009 148 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 147 Motion for Gregory A. Castanias to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/3/2009) (jfe)
December 4, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 146 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/19/2009, Receipt Number 706518. (jd)
November 23, 2009 145 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross Eric Morrison on behalf of United States Patent and Trademark Office (Morrison, Ross)
November 20, 2009 147 Featured Case MOTION for Gregory A. Castanias to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young, Myriad Genetics, Inc.(dle)
November 20, 2009 144 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young, Myriad Genetics, Inc..(Nguyen, Lynda)
November 20, 2009 143 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants' oppositions to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment as well as any cross-motions for summary judgment will be filed no later than December 23, 2009. Plaintiffs' reply for their motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendants' cross-motions for summary judgment will be filed no later than January 8, 2010. Defendants' reply for their cross-motion for summary judgment will be filed no later than January 15, 2010. Oral argument on the parties' motions for summary judgment will be held at 9:00 a.m., on Thursday, January 21, 2010, in Courtroom 18C. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/20/2009) (jpo)
November 20, 2009 142 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office.(Goldman, Beth)
November 19, 2009 146 Featured Case MOTION for Susan Berke Fogel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by National Women's Health Network, Asian Communities for Reproductive Justice, Center for Genetics and Society, Generations Ahead, Pro-Choice Alliance for Responsible Research.(dle) Modified on 11/30/2009 (dle).
November 17, 2009 141 Featured Case STIPULATION that the time for defendants, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Myriad Genetics, Betz, Boyer, Brittain, Combe, Gesteland, Jensen, Morris, Parks, Pershing, and Young, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be and hereby is extended to and including 11/20/09. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/17/09) (dle)
November 2, 2009 140 Featured Case OPINION:# 98205 For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint is denied. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment will be due December 2, 2009. Plaintiffs' reply will be due on December 9, 2009, and argument will be heard on December 11, 2009, at ten o'clock in the forenoon in Courtroom l8C, unless good cause is shown to alter the date of the submissions. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment: (Replies due by 12/9/2009. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/1/09) (db) Modified on 11/3/2009 (eef).
November 2, 2009 139 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lynda Quang Nguyen on behalf of Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young, Myriad Genetics, Inc. (Nguyen, Lynda)
September 23, 2009 138 Featured Case DECLARATION of Barry R. Satine in Support re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Satine, Barry)
September 23, 2009 137 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Satine, Barry)
September 23, 2009 136 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 59 MOTION for Discovery.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Fine, Aden)
September 23, 2009 135 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Goldman, Beth)
September 22, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 134 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
September 22, 2009 134 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 131 Motion for George Kimbrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/22/09) (tro)
September 22, 2009 133 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 126 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/22/09) (tro)
September 22, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 131 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/11/2009, Receipt Number 699435. (jd)
September 16, 2009 132 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 59 MOTION for Discovery.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing. (Satine, Barry)
September 11, 2009 131 Featured Case MOTION for George Kimbrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by The International Center for Technology Assessment.(dle)
September 10, 2009 130 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Mark Daniel Risk on behalf of The International Center for Technology Assessment.(Risk, Mark)
September 10, 2009 129 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. no Corporate Parent. Document filed by The International Center for Technology Assessment.(Risk, Mark)
September 10, 2009 128 Featured Case BRIEF re: 126 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs. Amicus Brief. Document filed by The International Center for Technology Assessment.(Risk, Mark)
September 10, 2009 127 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 126 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs.. Document filed by The International Center for Technology Assessment. (Risk, Mark)
September 10, 2009 126 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs. Document filed by The International Center for Technology Assessment.(Risk, Mark)
September 9, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Pretrial Conference held on 9/9/2009. (mro)
September 3, 2009 125 Featured Case STIPULATION: IT HEREBY IS STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel subject to the approval of the Court that: 1. The time for defendants, Myriad Genetics, Betz, Boyer, Brittain, Combe, Gesteland, Jensen, Morris, Parks, Pcrsbing, and Young, to file their opposition to plaintiffs' motion for jurisdictional discovery shall be extended from September 10, 2009 to and including September 16, 2009. 2. The time for plaintiffs to file their reply in support of their motion for jurisdictional discovery shall be extended from September 17, 2009 to and including September 23, 2009. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/2/2009) (jfe)
September 3, 2009 124 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Jennifer Rubin dated 8/28/2009 re: Amici Curiae respectfully request that the Court grant them leave to file their proposed amicus curiae brief. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/2/2009) (jfe)
September 2, 2009 123 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by March of Dimes.(Shtilerman, Mark)
September 1, 2009 122 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment and jurisdictional discovery will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 30, 2009, in Courtroom 18C. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. Set Hearing as to 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment. 59 MOTION for Discovery: (Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2009 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/27/09) (db)
September 1, 2009 121 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT re: 106 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (AMA), AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HUMAN GENETICS (ASHG), AMERICANCOLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS (ACOG), AMERICAN COLLEGE OF EMBRYOLOGY (ACE), AND THE MEDICAl SOCIETY OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK (MSSNY) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT. ORDER granting 106 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/31/09) (db)
September 1, 2009 120 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT re: 97 Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. ORDER granting 97 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/31/09) (db)
August 31, 2009 119 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Claire Altman Heine Foundation, Inc..(Shtilerman, Mark)
August 28, 2009 118 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. no Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Women's Health Network, Asian Communities for Reproductive Justice, Center for Genetics and Society, Generations Ahead, Pro-Choice Alliance for Responsible Research.(Rubin, Jennifer)
August 28, 2009 117 Featured Case PROPOSED BRIEF Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by National Women's Health Network, Asian Communities for Reproductive Justice, Center for Genetics and Society, Generations Ahead, Pro-Choice Alliance for Responsible Research.(Rubin, Jennifer)
August 28, 2009 116 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 115 MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (by letter motion). Document filed by National Women's Health Network, Asian Communities for Reproductive Justice, Center for Genetics and Society, Generations Ahead, Pro-Choice Alliance for Responsible Research. (Rubin, Jennifer)
August 28, 2009 115 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by National Women's Health Network, Asian Communities for Reproductive Justice, Center for Genetics and Society, Generations Ahead, Pro-Choice Alliance for Responsible Research.(Rubin, Jennifer)
August 28, 2009 114 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lindsay Rubin on behalf of National Women's Health Network, Asian Communities for Reproductive Justice, Center for Genetics and Society, Generations Ahead, Pro-Choice Alliance for Responsible Research (Rubin, Jennifer)
August 28, 2009 113 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Sandra S. Park dated 8/20/2009 re: Counsel respectfully request that the Court approve the filing of a memorandum of law of no more than 40 pages in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/25/2009) (jfe)
August 28, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 112 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jfe)
August 28, 2009 112 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 33 Motion for Barbara A. Caulfield, Michael J. Malecek and Stephen C. Holmes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/25/2009) (jfe)
August 27, 2009 111 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Tay-Sachs & Allied Diseases Association.(Shtilerman, Mark)
August 27, 2009 110 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Massachusetts Breast Cancer Coalition.(Shtilerman, Mark)
August 27, 2009 109 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Canavan Foundation.(Shtilerman, Mark)
August 27, 2009 108 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Organization for Rare Disorders.(Shtilerman, Mark)
August 27, 2009 107 Featured Case BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by American Medical Association, American Society of Human Genetics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Embryology, Medical Society of the State of New York.(Katz, Amy)
August 27, 2009 106 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by American Medical Association, American Society of Human Genetics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Embryology, Medical Society of the State of New York.(Katz, Amy)
August 27, 2009 105 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Medical Society of the State of New York.(Katz, Amy)
August 27, 2009 104 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American College of Embryology.(Katz, Amy)
August 27, 2009 103 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists.(Katz, Amy)
August 27, 2009 102 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Society of Human Genetics.(Katz, Amy)
August 27, 2009 101 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Medical Association.(Katz, Amy)
August 27, 2009 100 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Amy Lynn Katz on behalf of American Medical Association, American Society of Human Genetics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Embryology, Medical Society of the State of New York.(Katz, Amy)
August 26, 2009 99 Featured Case NOTICE of (Proposed) Brief Amici Curiae re: 97 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by March of Dimes, Claire Altman Heine Foundation, Inc., Massachusetts Breast Cancer Coalition, National Organization for Rare Disorders, National Tay-Sachs & Allied Diseases Association, Canavan Foundation. (Shtilerman, Mark)
August 26, 2009 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 97 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by March of Dimes, Claire Altman Heine Foundation, Inc., Massachusetts Breast Cancer Coalition, National Organization for Rare Disorders, National Tay-Sachs & Allied Diseases Association, Canavan Foundation. (Shtilerman, Mark)
August 26, 2009 97 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Canavan Foundation, March of Dimes, Claire Altman Heine Foundation, Inc., Massachusetts Breast Cancer Coalition, National Organization for Rare Disorders, National Tay-Sachs & Allied Diseases Association. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order For Leave To File Brief Amicus Curiae)(Shtilerman, Mark)
August 26, 2009 96 Featured Case DECLARATION of Kathleen Raker in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 95 Featured Case DECLARATION of Vicky Thomason in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 94 Featured Case DECLARATION of Patrice Fortune in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 93 Featured Case DECLARATION of Genae Girard in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 92 Featured Case DECLARATION of Runi Limary in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 91 Featured Case DECLARATION of Lisbeth Ceriani in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 90 Featured Case DECLARATION of Judy Norsigian in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 89 Featured Case DECLARATION of Barbara A. Brenner in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 88 Featured Case DECLARATION of Elsa W. Reich, M.S. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 87 Featured Case DECLARATION of Ellen T. Matloff, M.S. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 86 Featured Case DECLARATION of David H. Ledbetter, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 85 Featured Case DECLARATION of Harry Ostrer, M.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 84 Featured Case DECLARATION of Arupa Ganguly, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 83 Featured Case DECLARATION of Haig H. Kazazian, Jr., M.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 82 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Kant, M.D., Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 81 Featured Case DECLARATION of John Scott in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 80 Featured Case DECLARATION of Roger A. Hubbard, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 79 Featured Case DECLARATION of John R. Ball in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 78 Featured Case DECLARATION of Wendy K. Chung, M.D., Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 77 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael S. Watson, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 76 Featured Case DECLARATION of Madhuri R. Hegde, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 75 Featured Case DECLARATION of Mark Sobel in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 74 Featured Case DECLARATION of Susan M. Love, M.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 73 Featured Case DECLARATION of Shobita Parthasarathy, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 72 Featured Case DECLARATION of Mildred K. Cho, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 71 Featured Case DECLARATION of Elizabeth M. Swisher, M.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 70 Featured Case DECLARATION of Myles W. Jackson, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 69 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christopher E. Mason, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 68 Featured Case DECLARATION of Debra G.B. Leonard, M.D., Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 67 Featured Case DECLARATION of Wayne W. Grody, M.D., Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 66 Featured Case DECLARATION of Sir John E. Sulston, Ph.D. in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 65 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel B. Ravicher in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 part A, # 2 Exhibit 5 part B, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 64 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel B. Ravicher in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 part A, # 2 Exhibit 1 part B, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 part A, # 5 Exhibit 3 part B, # 6 Exhibit 4 part A, # 7 Exhibit 4 part B)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 63 Featured Case RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 61 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. Responses due by 9/10/2009 Return Date set for 9/30/2009 at 12:00 PM.(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 60 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 59 MOTION for Discovery.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 59 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. Return Date set for 9/30/2009 at 12:00 PM.(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 58 Featured Case DECLARATION of Kathleen Raker in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 57 Featured Case DECLARATION of Vicky Thomason in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 56 Featured Case DECLARATION of Patrice Fortune in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 55 Featured Case DECLARATION of Genae Girard in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 54 Featured Case DECLARATION of Runi Limary in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 53 Featured Case DECLARATION of Lisbeth Ceriani in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 52 Featured Case DECLARATION of Judy Norsigian in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 51 Featured Case DECLARATION of Barbara A. Brenner in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 50 Featured Case DECLARATION of Elsa W. Reich, M.S. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 49 Featured Case DECLARATION of Ellen T. Matloff, M.S. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 48 Featured Case DECLARATION of David H. Ledbetter, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 47 Featured Case DECLARATION of Harry Ostrer, M.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 46 Featured Case DECLARATION of Arupa Ganguly, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 45 Featured Case DECLARATION of Haig H. Kazazian, Jr., M.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 44 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Kant, M.D., Ph.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 43 Featured Case DECLARATION of John Scott in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 42 Featured Case DECLARATION of Roger A. Hubbard, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 41 Featured Case DECLARATION of John R. Ball in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 40 Featured Case DECLARATION of Wendy K. Chung, M.D., Ph.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 39 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael S. Watson, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 38 Featured Case DECLARATION of Madhuri R. Hegde, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 37 Featured Case DECLARATION of Mark Sobel in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 36 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel B. Ravicher in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 35 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 26, 2009 34 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker. (Hansen, Christopher)
August 21, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $75.00, paid on 08/20/2009, Receipt Number 697811. (jd)
August 20, 2009 33 Featured Case MOTION for Barbara A. Caulfield, Michael J. Malecek and Stephen C. Holmes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by March of Dimes, Claire Altman Heine Foundation, Inc., Massachusetts Breast Cancer Coalition, National Organization for Rare Disorders, National Tay-Sachs & Allied Diseases Association.(dle) Modified on 8/21/2009 (dle).
August 20, 2009 32 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark D Shtilerman on behalf of March of Dimes, Claire Altman Heine Foundation, Inc., Massachusetts Breast Cancer Coalition, National Organization for Rare Disorders, National Tay-Sachs & Allied Diseases Association (Shtilerman, Mark)
July 28, 2009 31 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: 1. The time for plaintiffs to tile their oppositions to defendants' motions to dismiss shall be extended from July 27, 2009 to August 26, 2009. 2. The time for defendants to file their replies in support of their motions to dismiss shall be extended from August 3, 2009 to September 23, 2009. 3. The time for the hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss set by Courtorder of July 15, 2009 shall be adjourned from noon on August 26, 2009 to noon on September 30. 2009. 4. The pretrial conference scheduled for 4:30 p.m. on August 26, 2009 shall be rescheduled for a date following the determination of the motions to dismiss. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 27 MOTION to Dismiss. 25 MOTION to Dismiss: (Responses due by 8/26/2009. Replies due by 9/23/2009. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2009 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Responses due by 8/26/2009. Replies due by 9/23/2009.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/22/09) (db)
July 16, 2009 30 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss will be heard at noon on Wednesday, August 26, 2009, in Courtroom 18C. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/15/2009) (tve)
July 13, 2009 29 Featured Case DECLARATION of Barry R. Satine in Support re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Satine, Barry)
July 13, 2009 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Satine, Barry)
July 13, 2009 27 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young.(Satine, Barry)
July 13, 2009 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Goldman, Beth)
July 13, 2009 25 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office. Return Date set for 8/12/2009 at 12:00 PM.(Goldman, Beth)
June 16, 2009 24 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER If this action has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are directed to file or mail a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination of the action prior to the date of the pretrial conference with Tsz Chan, Courtroom Clerk to Judge Sweet, Room 18C. U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007; otherwise counsel are directed to appear in courtroom 18C on Aug 26,09 at 4:30 pm for a pretrial conference for the purpose of discussing settlement with the court, exploring contemplated motions, stipulating facts, arranging a plan and schedule for all discovery, resolving any anticipated discovery issues, and setting a time for trial. ( Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2009 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/16/2009) (jmi)
June 10, 2009 23 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michael K. Young served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Becky Lang, Executive Secretary to Michael Young. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 22 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. David W. Pershing served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Natasha Hansen, Executive Secretary to David Pershing. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 21 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Thomas Parks served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Thomas Parks, personally. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 20 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Myriad Genetics served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009; Myriad Genetics, Inc. served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Mark Capone, Chief Operating Officer. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 19 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Kendall Morris served on 5/14/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by John Kendall Morris, personally. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 18 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. James U. Jensen served on 5/19/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by James U. Jensen, personally. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 17 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Raymond Gesteland served on 5/14/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Raymond Gesteland, personally. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 16 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Arnold B. Combe served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Angie Mitchell, Secretary to Arnold Combe. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 15 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jack Brittain served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Kathy Hajeh, Secretary to Jack Brittain. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 14 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Roger Boyer served on 5/19/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Rachael Niusula, Assistant. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 10, 2009 13 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lorris Betz served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was accepted by Sue Dean, Secretary to Lorris Betz. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Ravicher, Daniel)
June 1, 2009 12 Featured Case AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Inc..(Satine, Barry)
May 29, 2009 11 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Barry R. Satine dated 5/28/2009 re: Requesting that the time for Myriad and the Foundation Directors to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint be extended to and including July 13, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/28/2009) (jpo) Modified on 6/8/2009 (jpo).
May 28, 2009 10 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry R. Satine on behalf of Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young, Myriad Genetics, Inc. (Satine, Barry)
May 28, 2009 9 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Myriad Genetics, Inc..(Satine, Barry)
May 21, 2009 8 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Patent and Trademark Office served on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology; College of American Pathologists; Association For Molecular Pathology; Haig Kazazian; Arupa Ganguly; Wendy Chung; Harry Ostrer; David Ledbetter; Stephen Warren; Ellen Matloff; Elsa Reich; Breast Cancer Action; Boston Women's Health Book Collective; American College of Medical Genetics; Lisbeth Ceriani; Runi Limary; Genae Girard; Patrice Fortune; Vicky Thomason; Kathleen Raker. (Park, Sandra)
May 12, 2009 Featured Case Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)
May 12, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Lenora Michelle Lapidus for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (ama)
May 12, 2009 7 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boston Women's Health Book Collective.(ama)
May 12, 2009 6 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Breast Cancer Action.(ama)
May 12, 2009 5 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by College of American Pathologists.(ama)
May 12, 2009 4 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology.(ama)
May 12, 2009 3 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American College of Medical Genetics.(ama)
May 12, 2009 2 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Association For Molecular Pathology.(ama)
May 12, 2009 Featured Case Case Designated ECF. (ama)
May 12, 2009 Featured Case Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (ama)
May 12, 2009 Featured Case SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Patent and Trademark Office, Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (ama)
May 12, 2009 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against United States Patent and Trademark Office, Myriad Genetics, Lorris Betz, Roger Boyer, Jack Brittain, Arnold B. Combe, Raymond Gesteland, James U. Jensen, John Kendall Morris, Thomas Parks, David W. Pershing, Michael K. Young. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 687779)Document filed by American Society For Clinical Pathology, College of American Pathologists, Association For Molecular Pathology, Haig Kazazian, Arupa Ganguly, Wendy Chung, Harry Ostrer, David Ledbetter, Stephen Warren, Ellen Matloff, Elsa Reich, Breast Cancer Action, Boston Women's Health Book Collective, American College of Medical Genetics, Lisbeth Ceriani, Runi Limary, Genae Girard, Patrice Fortune, Vicky Thomason, Kathleen Raker.(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Association For Molecular Pathology et al v. United States Patent and Trademark Office et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association For Molecular Pathology
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American College of Medical Genetics
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Society For Clinical Pathology
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: College of American Pathologists
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haig Kazazian
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arupa Ganguly
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Chung
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Ostrer
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ledbetter
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Warren
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Matloff
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Reich
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breast Cancer Action
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Women's Health Book Collective
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisbeth Ceriani
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Runi Limary
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genae Girard
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Fortune
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Thomason
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Raker
Represented By: Daniel Ben Ravicher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Patent and Trademark Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myriad Genetics
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorris Betz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Boyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Brittain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold B. Combe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Gesteland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James U. Jensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kendall Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Parks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Pershing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]