Radford v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Jimmy Radford
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2011cv00347
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: NASH
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and granting 35 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/19/2012. (Marsh, K)
August 20, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiffs motion is GRANTED and defendants motion is DENIED. The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and REMANDED for an award of benefits. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/20/2012. (Marsh, K)
February 24, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 59 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/24/2014. (Fisher, M.)
February 9, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITH MODIFICATIONS 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees: The plaintiff's motion is granted, but the award is reduced to $20,000.00. Counsel shall reimburse the $10,000 EAJA fee to the plaintiff as it represents the lesser of the two fees awarded. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/6/2015. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radford v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Radford
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.