CARTER v. ARCHDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT et al

Defendant: CITY OF ARCHDALE, DAVID JONES, ARCHDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, GARLAND YATES and RANDOLPH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Plaintiff: JAMES J. CARTER
Case Number: 1:2013cv00613
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Randolph
Referring Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/22/2013, that Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Stay and Injunction (Docket Entry 6 ) be denied. (Lloyd, Donna)
September 10, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/10/2013 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 18 ; that Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Stay and Injunction (Doc. 6 ) is DENIED. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 25, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 2/25/2014; that the motions to dismiss filed by Garland Yates and the Randolph County District Attorney's Office (Docs. 12 , 33 ) are GRANTED and Carter's claims against those Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 54 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER that all pending motions for sanctions are DENIED. (Docs. 40 , 43 , 46 , 49 .) FURTHER that Carter's motion to compel a Rule 26(f) conference (Doc. 38 ) is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge and that Carter's motion to expedite (Doc. 56 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 2, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 5/2/2014, that Assistant Clerk Haynes's Objection to Subpoena and Motion to Quash (Docket Entry 63 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART in that the subpoena at issue is modified to require production only of a copy of the contents of the state court file for case number 12CR53047. (Lloyd, Donna) (Incorrect event was selected and document has been refiled to correct the event.) (Lloyd, Donna)
December 1, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/1/2014; that Plaintiff pay Defendants' reasonable expenses of $381.00. RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Failure to Comply with Court Order (Docket Entry 74 ) be granted. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 19, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: 74 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution filed by ARCHDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF ARCHDALE, DAVID JONES, and 77 Memorandum and Opinion, Order, Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Failure to Comply with Court Order (Doc. 74) is GRANTED and that this action is DISMISSED. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/19/2014. (Solomon, Dianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. ARCHDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ARCHDALE
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID JONES
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCHDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLAND YATES
Represented By: DAVID J. ADINOLFI, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDOLPH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Represented By: DAVID J. ADINOLFI, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. CARTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]