Cruz v. TRT Holdings, Inc., et al.

Defendant: Omni Charlotte Hotel, Omni Hotels, FNU LNU, John Doe, Omni Security Guards, XYZ Corporations, John Does 1-10 and TRT Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anny Cruz
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00110
Filed: March 7, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to withdraw 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and to file appropriate motion for special admission by 5/24/2011. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/19/2011. (bsw)
June 7, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/7/2011. (tmg)
July 26, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that within 30 days of this order 1) plaintiff shall respond to 37 MOTION to Dismiss 2) retain local counsel or appear pro se 3) make showing why matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute.(Responses due by 8/26/2011.) Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/26/2011. (bsw)
September 26, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated September 26, 2011. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cruz v. TRT Holdings, Inc., et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Charlotte Hotel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Security Guards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRT Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Patrick Lea Robson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anny Cruz
Represented By: Karim Arzadi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]