Celgard, LLC v. Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd.

Defendant: Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Celgard, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00122
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeffrey K. Sherwood,Dipu A. Doshi for Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/19/2013. (blf)
June 26, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James W. Brady for Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/26/2013. (blf)
July 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/8/2013. (blf)
July 19, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/19/2013. (blf)
August 8, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Seal Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/8/2013. (tmg)
August 16, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/16/2013. (blf)
September 6, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William W. Schwarze for Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/5/2013. (blf)
September 9, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/9/2013. (eef)
October 15, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd. ( Objections to M&R due by 11/1/2013), ORDER granting 47 , denying [49 55 65 , granting in part 32 , denying as moot 43 .. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/15/2013. (blf)
November 13, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 77 Memorandum and Recommendations.; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/12/2013. (blf)
December 10, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/10/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celgard, LLC v. Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celgard, LLC
Represented By: J. Steven Gardner
Represented By: Lance A. Lawson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]