Celgard, LLC v. SK Innovation Co., Ltd.

Defendant: SK Innovation Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Celgard, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00254
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/5/2014. (blf)
February 18, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/17/2014. (blf)
February 25, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 107 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/24/2014. (blf)
February 25, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/25/2014. (blf)
March 7, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 118 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/7/2014. (blf)
May 12, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 131 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Cortney S. Alexander for SK Innovation Co., Ltd.Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/12/2014. (tmg)
May 16, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/16/2014. (eef)
May 29, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 150 Motion for Joinder of Hearings. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/29/2014. (eef)
June 2, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 154 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/2/2014. (tmg)
June 3, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 163 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/3/2014. (eef)
July 1, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 , 14 , 15 , 16 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeffrey William Abraham, Mindy L. Ehrenfried, Minjae Kang, Charles Suh for SK Innovation Co., Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/1/2013. (tmg)
June 13, 2014 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 184 Motion to Seal Documents 188 Sealed Document, 186 Sealed Document and 187 Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/13/14. (mga)
June 17, 2014 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 180 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Renewed Motion to Dismiss (document #156) is STAYED ; denying as moot 181 Motion Consent Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/17/2014. (eef)
June 17, 2014 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 180 Motion for Extension of Time to file response/reply re: 156 motion ; denying as moot 181 Consent Motion for Expedited Briefing and Consideration. Parties shall comply with instructions as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/17/2014. (chh)
June 19, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 138 Second MOTION to Compel Responses to Celgard's Discovery Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/19/2014. (eef)
July 2, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants Discovery Proposal Further to the Courts Order Granting In Part Skis Motion for Show Cause Order and for Further Appropriate Relief (#183) is adopted in full, and plaintiff shall fully answer, otherwise produce, and make available witnesses for depositions as therein proposed, all within 30 days. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/1/2014. (eef)
July 22, 2014 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 227 , 228 , 229 , 230 , 231 , 232 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jacqueline Kimberley Lee, Jane Louise Froyd, Patrick Thomas Michael, Jennifer L. Swize, Christopher J. Lovrien, Tharan Gregory Lanier for Celgard, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/22/2014. (tmg)
July 23, 2014 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 234 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Audra A. Dial for Celgard, LLC,Audra A. Dial for Celgard, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 07/23/2014. (jlk)
August 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Hala S. Mourad for SK Innovation Co., Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/14/2013. (blf)
August 29, 2014 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 148 Motion to Expedite; granting 156 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; affirming 236 Memorandum and Recommendations.; granting 238 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 251 Motion for Prelimi nary Injunction; denying 256 Motion to Stay. This action is dismissed without prejudice as to re-filing in a jurisdiction where personal jurisdiction of this defendant is found. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/29/2014. (eef)
August 29, 2014 266 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/29/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
August 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Smith R. Brittingham, IV for SK Innovation Co., Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/19/13. (bsw)
November 7, 2014 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, as to 275 SEALED MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by SK Innovation Co., Ltd.; 272 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions by SK Innovation Co., Ltd.; ( Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/06/2014. (jlk)
September 9, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdication; Declaration of Mr. Odom; Declaration of Mr. Smith and Plaintiff's Alternative Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/9/2013. (eef)
September 23, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/23/2013. (blf)
October 1, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/1/2013. (blf)
October 16, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in Alternative, to Transfer filed by SK Innovation Co., Ltd., 27 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DEFEN DANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by SK Innovation Co., Ltd. ( Objections to M&R due by 11/4/2013), ORDER denying 54 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposi tion to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, granting 42 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) Plaintiff's Alternative Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by Celgard, LLC; (available to Celgard, LLC, SK Innovation Co., Ltd.).. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/16/2013. (blf)
November 5, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/4/2013. (blf)
November 26, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming Memorandum and Recommendations re 62 Memorandum and Recommendations.; denying without prejudice 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/26/2013. (tmg) Modified text on 11/26/2013 (tmg).
January 14, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric C. Jeschke for SK Innovation Co., Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/14/2014. (blf)
January 27, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/27/2014. (blf)
January 28, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/28/2014. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celgard, LLC v. SK Innovation Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Innovation Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celgard, LLC
Represented By: J. Steven Gardner
Represented By: Lance A. Lawson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]