WRK Rarities, LLC v. United States Attorney General, et al.

Defendant: United States of America, United States Attorney General and United States Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio
Plaintiff: WRK Rarities, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv00791
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Youngstown Office
County: Mahoning
Presiding Judge: Benita Y. Pearson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum of Opinion and Order. The Court approves the withdrawal of Plaintiff's 3 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, and cancels the hearing and briefing schedule previously set. Additionally, the Co urt approves the following requests made by the parties in the Stipulation: 1) Plaintiff will be permitted to amend its Complaint within 15 days of the Courts Order approving the Stipulation; 2) Defendants will respond to the foregoing Amended Compl aint (or Complaint if no Amended Complaint is filed) within 60 days as provided for under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12; and 3) thereafter, the Court will set forth a normal pre-trial and trial schedule that includes discovery, dispositive motions, and a trial date. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/1/13. (S,HR)
November 4, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants the Motion to Dismiss filed by Kimpel and Leonard (ECF No. 34 ) and dismisses their claims without prejudice. The United States' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27 ) is denied as moot. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/4/2013. (JLG)
April 10, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order For the aforementioned reasons, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 3 ).The Court sets a preliminary injunction hearing for 5/17/2013, at 12:00 p.m., as well as the fo llowing briefing schedule: Plaintiff's opening brief no later than 4/29/2013; Defendants' response no later than 5/10/2013; and Plaintiff's reply no later than 5/15/2013.The parties are reminded they are encouraged to talk to one an other and attempt to resolve the dispute. Minimally, the Court will expect the parties to enter into stipulations of fact and law whenever possible.A transcript of the TRO hearing may be obtained by contacting Court Reporter Mary Uphold at 330-884-7424. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/10/2013. (S,L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRK Rarities, LLC v. United States Attorney General, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen A. Sherman
Represented By: David Augustin Ruiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Represented By: David Augustin Ruiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio
Represented By: David Augustin Ruiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WRK Rarities, LLC
Represented By: Stephen T. Bolton(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David A. Detec
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]