Nelson v. Clermont County Veterans' Service Commission

Plaintiff: Kristan D Nelson
Defendant: Clermont County Veterans' Service Commission and Clermont County, Ohio Board of Commissioners
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00335
Filed: May 20, 2011
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: CLERMONT
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 103 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendation 85 ; granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to D ismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Clerk of Courts is directed to file plaintiff's Tendered Second Amended Complaint (#87). Defense shall file their Answer with 14 days. Counsel shall submit a proposed scheduling order within 10 days. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 3/11/13. (do1)
November 1, 2013 162 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Defendant's Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment. The claim of intentional infliction of emotional distress is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 11/1/13. (mb)
March 15, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All Claims against the Board are dismissed with prejudice and the Board is hereby Dismissed as a party from this action. Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendant shall proceed according to the prior scheduling order. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 3/15/12. (do1)
June 6, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss (construed as a motion pursuant to Rule 12(c)). Counts One and Two are Dismissed. This case shall proceed to trial as previously scheduled by the Court. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 6/6/12. (do1)
August 27, 2012 82 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/27/12. (jl1)
September 10, 2012 85 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Kristan D Nelson, 36 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Clermont County Veterans' Service Commissio n, 58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Clermont County Veterans' Service Commission: defendant's 2nd motion to dismiss (Doc. 36) be GRANTED IN PART; plaintiff's motion for leave to file 2nd amended complaint (Doc. 51) be GRANTED IN PART; defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. 58 be GRANTED IN PART. Except as specifically granted in part herein, the motions of both parties (Doc. 36, 51, 58) should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/10/12. (jl1)
September 10, 2012 86 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff re-draft her second amended complaint in accordance with the R&R filed this date and file that as a "Notice" of her tendered pleading on or before 9/21/12; defendant's time to answer shall not begin to run until or unless the presiding district judge adopts the R&R filed this date; defendant's motion to extend the dispositive motion deadline (Doc. 84) is GRANTED. The Court will set new dispositive motion deadline, discovery and status deadlines after the R&R and any objections concerning the deposition of Mr. Bare are ruled on by District Judge Weber. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/10/12. (jl1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nelson v. Clermont County Veterans' Service Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristan D Nelson
Represented By: Richard Scott Hughes
Represented By: Robert Joseph Hollingsworth
Represented By: Susan R Bell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clermont County Veterans' Service Commission
Represented By: Helen E Mason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clermont County, Ohio Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Helen E Mason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]