Rachel v. United Dairy Farmers

Plaintiff: Darrian Rachel
Defendant: United Dairy Farmers
Case Number: 1:2012cv00575
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Presiding Judge: S Arthur Spiegel
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 11 Report and Recommendation. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs Amended Complaint with prejudice, and CERTIFIES that any appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith, therefore DENYING Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 1/3/2013. (km1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2013: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (km1).
October 2, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER rejecting and reversing 4 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 10/2/2012. (km1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2012: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (km1).
October 4, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 6 Order on Report and Recommendations : Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file an amended complaint, in which the plaintiff may allege actionable facts as pointed out by the District Court, within thirty (30) days from the dat of filing of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/4/2012. (jlw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2012: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachel v. United Dairy Farmers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrian Rachel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Dairy Farmers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]