United States of America v. Hamilton

Defendant: Rhonda Hamilton
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv00025
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: BROWN
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant shall have (30) days from the date of this Order to provide the IRS with the outstanding information requested in the IRS summons. The parties shall contact the Court for a telephone status conference in the event the information requested by the summons is not provided to the IRS within (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/6/2013. (art)
August 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following status conference. Defendant Hamilton is Ordered to provide information to the IRS in accordance with the following schedule. Tax return for year 2000 due by 8/24/2013; Tax return for year 2001 due by 8/31/2013; Tax return for year 2002 due by 9/6/2013; Tax return for year 2003 due by 9/13/2013; Tax return for year 2004 due by 9/20/2013; Tax return for the year 2005 due by 9/27/2013; Tax return for year 2006 due by 10/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/15/2013. (art)
February 19, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; this matter is closed. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/18/14. (ba1)
January 15, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause: Respondent to appear and show cause why she should not be compelled to comply with the USA's 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Show Cause Hearing set for 2/28/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 701 - Cincinnati before Mag istrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz.) USA to personally serve a copy of this Order, together with the petition and exhibits upon respondent Rhonda K. Hamilton within (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/15/2013. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Horwitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]