Parlin Funds LLC et al v. Citibank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Parlin Funds LLC and Parlin Family Foundation
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00111
Filed: February 12, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Sandra S Beckwith
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION & ORDER that Citibank may file any responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint with the Clerk of Court under seal in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/15/2013. (art)
May 7, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION & ORDER extending the time on or before 5/31/2013 in which plaintiffs may file Under Seal a response to defendants's 13 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/7/2013. (art)
June 11, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Citibank to file under seal on or before 6/28/2013 a reply to plaintiffs' memorandum of law in opposition to its pending 13 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/11/2013. (art)
July 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Sealed Motion to dismiss is granted. The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 7/30/13. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Parlin Funds LLC et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parlin Funds LLC
Represented By: Pierce Edward Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parlin Family Foundation
Represented By: Pierce Edward Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Douglas L Lutz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]