Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Clarence E. Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00234
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Referring Judge: J. Gregory Wehrman
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 11 Featured Case ORDER that the Court's referral 10 to Social Security Panel Attorney is hereby Rescinded. Plaintiff must proceed pro-se in this matter. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 3/20/2014 in which to file a statement of errors pursuant to the Magistrate Judges' General Order cocerning social security appeals. (Copy issued to pro-se plaintiff this date via regular and certified mail). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/5/2014. (art)
April 11, 2014 15 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's re 3 Complaint be Dismissed in its entirety for want of prosecution for failure to obey and Order of the Court. Any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith,a nd therefore deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/11/2014. (art)
May 23, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED in its entirety for want of prosecution and for failure to obey an Order of the Court. The Court certifies that an appeal of any Order adopting the Report and Recommendation will not be taken in good faith and therefore DENIES plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis in the Court of Appeals. Signed by Chief Judge Susan J. Dlott on 5/23/14. (sct1)
September 19, 2013 9 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order concerning social security appeals. Plaintiff's statement of errors due to be filed with the Court by 10/31/2013. (Magistrate Judges' General Order mailed along with this Order to pro-se plaintiff on this date.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/19/2013. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]