Bishop v. Sheriff Hamilton County et al

Defendant: John Doe fugitive warrant detectives and Sheriff Hamilton County
Plaintiff: Jason Bishop
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00258
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: PICKAWAY
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Complaint filed by Jason Bishop: Plaintiff's motion to amend or correct his complaint (Doc. 8) is GRANTED; AND RECOMMENDED THAT plaintiff's due process and 4th Am endment claims be DISMISSED and the Court certify that an appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny IFP. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the amended complaint, summons, the separate order granting IFP, the May 3, 2013 Report and Recommendation, and this Order and Report and Recommendation upon defendants, as directed by plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Objections to R&R due by 7/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/11/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jl1)
December 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations [4 & 10]. Plaintiff's due process and 4th Amendment claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is recommitted to the Mag. Judge. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 12/4/13. (mb)
December 6, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jason Bishop. It is RECOMMENDED that this case be dismissed based upon Plaintiff's failure to keep the Court apprised of his current address, and corresponding failure to prosecut e. In the alternative, dismissal is recommended for failure to state a claim, both in light of Plaintiff's previously acknowledged failure to first exhause his administrative remedies, and because the allegation of actual injury that might othe rwise support a non-frivolous First Amendment claim is refuted by the dismissal of Plaintiff's Indiana lawsuit for failure to keep that court apprised of his address. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/6/2013. (km1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2013: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (km1).
February 12, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 21 ; Dismissing case. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 2/12/14. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bishop v. Sheriff Hamilton County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe fugitive warrant detectives
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Hamilton County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Bishop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]