Beckstedt v. Commissioner of Social Security et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Sue Beckstedt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00261
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTATION ORDER granting defendant's 11 Motion for a Stay of case in light of lapse of appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/8/2013. (art)
January 16, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/16/15. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2015. (eh1)
February 10, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 15 Report and Recommendation; the decision by the Commissioner is reversed and remanded pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/9/15. (ba1)
June 13, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER regarding Magistrate Judges' General Order concerning Social Security Appeals. Plaintiff's statment of errors due to be filed by 7/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/13/2013. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckstedt v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sue Beckstedt
Represented By: James Roy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.