Sherrill v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Michelle Sherrill
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00276
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: WARREN
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order Concerning Social Security Appeals. Plaintiff's statement of errors due by 8/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/15/2013. (art)
October 2, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTATION ORDER granting defendant's 13 Motion to Stay agency's response in light of lapse of appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/2/2013. (art)
April 2, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the decision of the Commissioner be Reversed and Remanded for further proceedings pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g). Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/2/2014. (art)
April 28, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 21 Report and Recommendation; the decision by the commissioner is reversed and remanded. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/28/14. (ba1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sherrill v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sherrill
Represented By: Shoshana Rivka Pehowic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]