Washington v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Timothy Washington
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00278
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 9 Report and Recommendation adopting and reversing and remanding for further review based upon 8 Joint Stipulation for Remand by the parties. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/28/13. (ba1)
January 7, 2014 13 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees be GRANTED and that Plaintiff be awarded fees and expenses in the amount of $945.00. Objections to R&R due by 1/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/7/2014. (km1)
March 5, 2014 14 Featured Case ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 13 Report and Recommendation granting 12 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/5/14. (ba1)
July 31, 2013 9 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, filed by Timothy Washington : that Commissioner's decision be REVERSED under Sentence four and REMANDED for further review, in accordance with the Joint Stipulation to Remand (Doc. 8). Objections to R&R due by 8/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/31/13. (jl1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Washington v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Washington
Represented By: Shoshana Rivka Pehowic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]