Amer v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sharon Amer
Case Number: 1:2013cv00282
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Presiding Judge: S Arthur Spiegel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:425 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the decision of the Commissioner be Affirmed and this matter be closed on the docket of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/2/2014. (art)
April 24, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 Report and Recommendation in all respects. The decision of the Commissioner to deny Plaintiffs applications for Disability Insurance Benefits (DIB) and Supplemental Security Income (SSI) is AFFIRMED and the Court ORDERS that this case be closed on the docket. Signed by Judge S Arthur Spiegel on 4/24/2014. (km1)
April 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered by Clerk affirming Court Order 21 . (km1)
July 9, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to Magistrate Judges' General Order concerning Social Security Appeals. Plaintiff's statement of errors in this matter due by 8/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 7/9/2013. (art)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Amer
Represented By: Shoshana Rivka Pehowic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]