Bryant v. Central Community Health Board

Defendant: Central Community Health Board
Plaintiff: Cathy Bryant
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00355
Filed: May 24, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 5/7/2014. (eb)
June 3, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 27, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel to file Joint Litigation Plan by September 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 6/3/2013. (eb)
September 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 9/24/2013. (eb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bryant v. Central Community Health Board
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Community Health Board
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Bryant
Represented By: Charles Curtis Walden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]