Hughes v. Scioto County Sheriff's Department et al

Defendant: John Doe
Plaintiff: Crystal D. Hughes
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00569
Filed: August 16, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Crystal D. Hughes. it is therefore RECOMMENDED this action be DISMISSEDwith PREJUDICE for failure to state upon which relief may be granted as to Defendants Portsmouth Off icers Tim Taulbee, Dale Herman, Tyler Clifford, Kyle McCain, and Eric Brown. Furthermore, to the extent the amended complaint can be construed as asserting the claims previously dismissed by the court, such claims should be dismissed for the reasons stated in the Court's previous Report and Recommendation 4 . It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court certify that an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendationwould not be taken in good faith and therefore deny Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/16/2014. (km1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2014: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (km1).
July 30, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Judge Susan J. Dlott ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted as to defts Portsmouth Officers Taulbee, Herman, Clifford, McCain and Brown; to t he extent the amended complaint is construed as asserting the claims previously dismissed by the Court such claims are dismissed for the reasons stated in the Court of 10/3/13; court certifies an appeal of any Order will not be taken in good faith and denies plaintiff elave to appeal ifp. (vp)
November 17, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 44 Report and Recommendations: Defendants motions for judgment on the pleadings (Docs. 27 and 28) are GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against defendants Boone, Powell and Dunham areDISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/17/2014. (jlw1)
October 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 4 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs claim against the Scioto County Sheriff, Scioto County, Scioto Countys Commissioners and the City of Portsmouth, Ohio based on the theory of negligent supervisi on and inadequate training of their employees; Plaintiffs claims against the Scioto County Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs Department, the SCCC and the Scioto County Jail. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Chief Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/3/2013. (jlw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2013: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hughes v. Scioto County Sheriff's Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal D. Hughes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]