Visiting Nurse Association of Greater Cincinnati and Northern Kentucky v. Procare Home Health, Inc. et al

Defendant: Procare Home Health, Inc. and Healthtrends of Ohio, LLC
Plaintiff: Visiting Nurse Association of Greater Cincinnati and Northern Kentucky
Case Number: 1:2013cv00585
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND FOR OTHER RELIEF. Defendants shall have until November 4, 2013 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/18/2013. (mr1)
February 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/10/2014. (mr1)
February 21, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PROCARE'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING ITS REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (Doc. 24 ). ProCare Home Health, Inc. is TERMINATED from the docket. The case progresses as to Plaintiff and Defendant Healthtrends of Ohio, LLC. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/21/2014. (mr1)
July 29, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 37 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/29/2014. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visiting Nurse Association of Greater Cincinnati and Northern Kentucky v. Procare Home Health, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procare Home Health, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthtrends of Ohio, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visiting Nurse Association of Greater Cincinnati and Northern Kentucky
Represented By: Brett A Schatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]