Bellegia v. Givaudan Flavors Corp.

Plaintiff: Shawn Bellegia
Defendant: Givaudan Flavors Corp.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00654
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Presiding Judge: Herman J. Weber
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 12/16/2013. (eb)
February 2, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion for Hearing; granting 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Sandra S Beckwith on 2/2/15. (mb)
October 16, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 21, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel to file Joint Litigation Plan by February 1, 2014. Signed by Judge Herman J. Weber on 10/16/2013. (eb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellegia v. Givaudan Flavors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Bellegia
Represented By: Christopher Reid Cline
Represented By: Paul Henry Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Givaudan Flavors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.