Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC v. 4.895 Acres of Land, More of Less, In Butler County, Ohio et al.

Plaintiff: Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 4.895 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Butler County, Ohio, 3.69 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Belmont County, Ohio, .74 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Butler County, Ohio, .41 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Butler County, Ohio, 1.19 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 5.73 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 3.78 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 7.60 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 1.0 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 4.3 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, .16 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 3.97 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 1.38 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, .77 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 7.38 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio, 14 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter and Warren, Counties, Ohio, 3.98 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio, 8.20 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio, .08 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio, 4.92 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio, 1.997 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio, 3.7 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio, 6.80 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio, 1.92 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio, .26 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio, 3.625 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio, 10.277 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio, 6.52 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio, 7.187 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio, 5.199 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio, 16.38 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio, 7.73 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 4.824 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 6.356 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 2.19 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 3.477 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 3.438 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 4.16 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 6.81 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 2.932 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 3.58 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 13.65 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 3.12 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 10.98 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, .7 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 13.25 Acres Land, More or Less, In Monroe, County, Ohio, 7.71 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio, 3.85 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, .53 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, .303 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, 8.08 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, 4.6 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, 1.53 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, 1.50 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, 6.82 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio, 4.94 Acres Land, More or Less, In Noble, County, Ohio, 1.42 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio, 7.72 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio, 15.24 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio, 2.32 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio, 10.451 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio, 6.773 Acres Land, More or Less, In Perry, County, Ohio, 4.84 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 4.41 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 2.19 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 2.64 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 7.91 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 7.78 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 8.12 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 5.72 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 1.36 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 2.46 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, .49 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 1.11 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 4.65 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio, 7.426 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio and Unknown Owners
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00554
Filed: June 6, 2008
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Condemnation Office
County: PICKAWAY
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:717 Natural Gas Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 1035 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 967 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 1023 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 9/15/11. (kn)
December 19, 2011 1070 Featured Case ORDER adopting 1060 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 12/19/11. (kn)
February 12, 2009 597 Featured Case ORDER regarding the appointment of the Commissioners signed by Gregory L Frost on 2/12/09. (sem1, )
April 28, 2009 673 Featured Case ORDER conditionally granting 654 Defendants Paulus' Motion in Limine. Signed by Commission Chair Gregory M. Travalio on 4/28/09. (sem1, )
July 9, 2009 729 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER finding as moot 705 Motion for expedited bench trial. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 7/9/09. (jcw)
February 11, 2010 795 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 761 , 768 , 772 & 782 the Parties' Motions for Supplemental Instructions. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 2/11/10. (sem1)
April 26, 2010 827 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER memorializing the 4/6/10 through 4/7/10 Bench Trial in that the Court enters judgment in favor of defendant David Hedges and against Plaintiff in the amount of $5,478.00. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 4/26/10. (sem1)
July 30, 2010 875 Featured Case ORDER re 831 Report and Recommendation for the McCarty Defendants in that the Court finds the Objections are partially well taken and REMANDS the Report and Recommendation to the Commission for further consideration. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 7/30/10. (sem1)
September 9, 2010 894 Featured Case ORDER re REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 854 for the Alexander property in that the Court finds the Defendant's Objections partially well taken and REMANDS the Report and Recommendation to the Commission for further consideration. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 9/9/10. (sem1)
December 28, 2010 945 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 895 911 in that the Court enters judgment in favor of Defendants Jeffrey and Maureen McCarty and against Rockies Express Pipeline in the amount of $116,811.10. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 12/28/10. (sem1)
March 16, 2011 978 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the 11/11/10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 915 regarding the McKinley property. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 3/16/11. (sem1)
April 18, 2011 989 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING the 925 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding the Alexander Property. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Alexander and against Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC in the amount of $136,121.70. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 4/18/11. (sem1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC v. 4.895 Acres of Land, More of Less, In Butler County, Ohio et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Clifford C Masch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.895 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Butler County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.69 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Belmont County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .74 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Butler County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .41 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Butler County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.19 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.73 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.78 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.60 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.0 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.3 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .16 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.97 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.38 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .77 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.38 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14 Acres Land, More or Less, In Bulter and Warren, Counties, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.98 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.20 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .08 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.92 Acres Land, More or Less, In Clinton, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.997 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.7 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.80 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.92 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .26 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.625 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10.277 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fairfield, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.52 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.187 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.199 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16.38 Acres Land, More or Less, In Fayette, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.73 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.824 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.356 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.19 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.477 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.438 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.16 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.81 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.932 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.58 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13.65 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.12 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10.98 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .7 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13.25 Acres Land, More or Less, In Monroe, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.71 Acres Land, More or Less, In Guernsey, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.85 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .53 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .303 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.08 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.6 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.53 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.50 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.82 Acres Land, More or Less, In Muskingum, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.94 Acres Land, More or Less, In Noble, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.42 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.72 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15.24 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.32 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10.451 Acres Land, More or Less, In Pickaway, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.773 Acres Land, More or Less, In Perry, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.84 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.41 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.19 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.64 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.91 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.78 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.12 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.72 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.36 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.46 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .49 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.11 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.65 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.426 Acres Land, More or Less, In Warren, County, Ohio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]