Guinn, MD v. Mount Carmel Health Systems et al

Plaintiff: Vincent L. Guinn, MD
Defendant: Mount Carmel Health Systems, Trinity Health Corporation, Claus Von Zychlin, Thomas R. Alexis, MD, Michael R. Murnane, Medard R. Lutmerding, MD and Barney B. Beaver, DO
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00226
Filed: March 24, 2009
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: DELAWARE
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court Agreed Order that the Plaintiff shall file his Memorandum in Opposition to 115 the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 07/08/2013. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 06/25/2013. (dh1)
August 23, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 144 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defendant Michael Murnane. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 8/23/2013. (kk2)
August 29, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 115 ; granting in part and denying in part re 142 . Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/29/2013. (dh1)
September 11, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 143 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/11/2013. (dh1)
July 23, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Compel - MCH to provide any discovery responses withheld on grounds of physician-client privilege or peer review privilege & produce any documents responsive to Request for Production No. 23 w/in fourteen (14) days. The request for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 7/23/2010. (kk2)
July 26, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2011 at 11:00 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2012 at 9:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 1/23/2012 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/26/2011. (Attachment: FPTO Form) (dh1)
February 27, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Defendants' First Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 51 Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/27/2012. (dh1)
April 20, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference scheduled for 01/28/13 at 9:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 02/25/2013 at 9:00 a.m.; and Trial scheduled for 03/11/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 04/20/2012. (Attachments: (1) Order Setting Trial Date and Settlement Conference, (2) FPTO Form) (dh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guinn, MD v. Mount Carmel Health Systems et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent L. Guinn, MD
Represented By: Nicholas William Yaeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Carmel Health Systems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Health Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claus Von Zychlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Alexis, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Murnane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medard R. Lutmerding, MD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney B. Beaver, DO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]