SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC et al v. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC and Innovative Interfaces, Inc.
Defendant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01017
Filed: November 12, 2010
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2011 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Stay. All discovery is stayed pending a ruling on the defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 04/14/2011. (sr)
March 29, 2011 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/29/2011 before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (jv)
March 23, 2011 57 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 3/23/2011. (pes1)
March 23, 2011 56 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING NON-WAIVER OF PRIVILEGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 3/23/2011. (pes1)
March 22, 2011 55 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC & Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Agreed Protective Order) (Schaberg, Robert) Modified on 3/23/2011 to correct filers (kk2)
March 16, 2011 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re 53 First MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.'s 45 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. (Brewer, Martha)
March 7, 2011 53 First MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.'s 45 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Long, Thomas) Modified on 3/8/2011 to add doc link (kk2)
February 22, 2011 52 REPLY to Response to 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. (Brewer, Martha)
February 4, 2011 51 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re 50 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC (Shartsis, Mary Jo) Modified on 2/7/2011 to clarify text (kk2)
February 4, 2011 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Shartsis, Mary Jo)
January 24, 2011 49 NOTICE: Initial Conference RESET for 3/29/2011 @ 1:30pm by teleconference before Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp -Robert Kincaid Jr will initiate conf call to 614.719.3410 (wh1) (wh1).
December 29, 2010 48 NOTICE: Initial Conference RESET for 2/8/2011 @ 1:45pm in chambers before Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp (wh1)
December 29, 2010 Reset Deadlines as to 45 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 2/4/2011. (jcw1)
December 29, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 45 Motion to Dismiss. New date 2/4/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/29/10. (jcw1) Modified on 12/30/2010 to add doc link to mtn to dismiss (kk2)
December 22, 2010 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's 45 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. New date requested 2/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kincaid, Robert) Modified on 12/30/2010 to add doc link to mtn (kk2)
December 13, 2010 45 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. Responses due by 1/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Brewer, Martha)
December 3, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 , 37 , 38 , and 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arthur J. Shartsis, Mary Jo Shartsis, Richard F. Munzinger, and Robert E. Schaberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/3/2010. (pes1)
December 3, 2010 PHV Filing fee re: 36 , 37 , 38 , and 39 (A Shartsis, MJ Shartsis, Munzinger & Shaberg): $ 800, receipt number COL15114 (pes1)
December 3, 2010 43 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions LLC & Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Wilson, James)
December 2, 2010 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 40 Notice of Appearance of Thomas Leslie Long by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC (Long, Thomas) Modified on 12/3/2010 to clarify text (kk2)
December 2, 2010 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 35 Notice of Appearance of Robert Myron Kincaid, Jr by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC (Kincaid, Robert) Modified on 12/3/2010 to clarify text (kk2)
December 1, 2010 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Leslie Long for Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC (Long, Thomas)
December 1, 2010 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Schaberg by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Filing fee $ 200) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Kincaid, Robert)
December 1, 2010 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard F. Munzinger by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Filing fee $ 200) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Kincaid, Robert)
December 1, 2010 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mary Jo Shartsis by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Filing fee $ 200) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Kincaid, Robert)
December 1, 2010 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arthur J. Shartsis by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Filing fee $ 200) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Kincaid, Robert)
December 1, 2010 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Myron Kincaid, Jr for Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC (Kincaid, Robert)
November 24, 2010 34 NOTICE: Initial Conference set for 1/4/2011 @ 4:00pm in chambers before Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp - (Attachments: # 1 Important Notice-3, # 2 Notice re discovery) (wh1)
November 23, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. answer due 12/13/2010. Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition due by 01/14/2011. Reply due by 01/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/23/2010. (sr)
November 22, 2010 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and to Extend Date for Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. New dates requested 12/13/2010 & 1/14/2011. (Wilson, James) Modified on 11/23/2010 to clarify text (kk2)
November 15, 2010 31 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Arthur Joel Shartsis, Mary Jo C Shartsis, Robert E Schaberg, Simone Marie Katz-O'Neill & Carl Brandon Wisoff (kk2)
November 12, 2010 30 NOTICE of Docketing Transfer by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (kk2)
November 12, 2010 Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp added. (er1)
November 12, 2010 29 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:10-cv-03305. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 1, 2010 28 Transferred case to USDC-Southern Ohio. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
November 1, 2010 27 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Transferred case to USDC-Southern Ohio, Cincinnati. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
October 28, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 16 Motion to Transfer Venue.(jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
October 4, 2010 25 Reply Memorandum re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue filed byOCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 10/4/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 27, 2010 24 Request for Judicial Notice re 20 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 27, 2010 23 DECLARATION in Opposition to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of James Hofbauer filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 27, 2010 22 DECLARATION in Opposition to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Leslie Straus filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 27, 2010 21 DECLARATION in Opposition to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Mary Jo Shartsis filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 27, 2010 20 Memorandum in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 13, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE -Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue., ORDER Responses due by 9/27/2010. Replies due by 10/4/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 09/13/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 10, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated pursuant to the filing of the motion (Duplicate deadlines) 16 MOTION to Transfer Case. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 9, 2010 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. for OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons or Entities (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/9/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 9, 2010 17 Declaration of Bruce Crocco in Support of 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Bruce Crocco in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S. C. Section 1404(A) filed byOCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/9/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 9, 2010 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, MOTION to Change Venue filed by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/9/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
September 2, 2010 15 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/2/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 24, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James A. Wilson (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 23, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation Deferring Response Date and Setting Briefing Schedule on Transfer Motion. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 20, 2010 13 Proposed Order re 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611049597.) by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 20, 2010 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-James A. Wilson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611049597.) filed by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 13, 2010 10 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Deferring Response Date and Setting Briefing Schedule on Transfer Motion by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 8/13/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 12, 2010 9 Featured Case INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 6, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/6/10. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 5, 2010 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
August 4, 2010 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Innovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC and Request for Reassignment To A United States District Judge. (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 8/4/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
July 30, 2010 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. served on 7/29/2010, answer due 8/19/2010. (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
July 28, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
July 28, 2010 4 Certificate of Interested Persons or Entities filed by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Gerald M. Kline for Innovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
July 28, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 1/3/2011 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 1/10/2011 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
July 28, 2010 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc..(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]
July 28, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Federal & State Antitrust Violations, Unfair Competition & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611048637] Filed by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/12/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC et al v. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Simone Marie Katz-O'Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Interfaces, Inc.
Represented By: Simone Marie Katz-O'Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Represented By: James Allison Wilson, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]