Gascho v. Global Fitness Holdings, LLC

Plaintiff: Ashley Buckenmeyer, Michael J Hogan and Amber Gascho
Defendant: Global Fitness Holdings, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00436
Filed: May 19, 2011
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 9/23/13. (lvw1)
September 30, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 9-30-13. (ga)
April 4, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is RECOMMENDED that: (a) because the proposed settlement of the action on the terms and conditions set forth in the Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, adequate, and in the best interest of the Class and Subcla sses, the Settlement Agreement be finally approved by the Court; (b) the Class and Subclasses be finally certified for settlement purposes; (c) the Action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement; (d) Settling Pla intiffs be bound by the release set forth in the Settlement Agreement;Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2014. (e) Class Counsel be awarded reasonable fees and reimbursement of expenses in the amount of $2,390,000, (f) Class Representatives be award ed the Class Representative Enhancement Payments in the amounts specified in the Settlement Agreement, and (g) Global Fitnesss Motion to Strike Objection of Joshua Blackman, Doc. No. 125, be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/4/14. (jr1)
July 16, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 7/16/14. (lvw1)
July 16, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 7/16/14. (lvw1)
July 16, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court FINA JUDGMENT Case Terminated. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 7/16/14. (lvw1)
September 27, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 09/26/2011. (sr)
January 12, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Entry of dismiss without prejudice as to Plaintiff Michaela Woolum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/12/12. (rew) Modified on 1/12/2012 to add name of terminated party (kjm1).
March 28, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 3-28-12. (ga)
January 16, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 73 Motion for Certification. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 1-15-13. (ga)
September 3, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 89 MOTION to Intervene: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this motion be DENIED. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/3/2013. (er1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gascho v. Global Fitness Holdings, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Buckenmeyer
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Kenneth J Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Hogan
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Kenneth J Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Gascho
Represented By: Kenneth J Rubin
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: John M Kuhl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Fitness Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Erik J Clark
Represented By: Douglas R Cole
Represented By: Matthew A Kairis
Represented By: Alexis Jacqueline Zouhary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]